This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:16:14 (UTC).

California Restaurant vs Grand Occasions/DISMISSED

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 California Restaurant filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Grand Occasions/DISMISSED. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3831

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Restaurant Mutual Benefit Corporation

Defendant

Grand Occasions Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Trost, Glenn W

Novak Drauce Connolly Bove 333 Grand Ave., Ste. 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Case Management Conference- Original Type: Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 4-21-14. Dismissed gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. gar Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE185090.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 16-DEC-2013 by LESPARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 16-DEC-2013 by LESPARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: le Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for California Restaurant Mutual Benefit Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 185090 California Restaurant Mutual Benefit Corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for California Restaurant Mutual Benefit Corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: California Restaurant Mutual Benefit Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less