This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:18:54 (UTC).

California Business Bureau vs. Sandra M Wheatley

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 California Business Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sandra M Wheatley. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2121

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

California Business Bureau, Inc.

California Business Bureau Inc.

Defendants

Wheatley, Sandra Marie

Wheatley, Sean D.

Other

Fierro, Sandra M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Love, Franklin J.

800 So. Barranca Ave, #100

Covina, CA 91723

Defendant Attorneys

Wheatley, Sandra Marie

Wheatley, Sean D.

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Court Trial- Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CT scheduled for 06/25/14. judgment entered cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Stipulated Judgment Entered- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to stipulation of parties prior to trial disposing of entire action signed by Judge Dale Ikeda filed. Stipulated judgment in favor of Plaintiff California Business Bureau, Inc. against Defendants Sandra Marie Wheatley aka Sandra M Fierro and Sean D Wheatley in the sum of: Principal: $ 2796.22 Interest: $ 261.82 Costs: $ 324.00 Attorney: $ 559.00 Total: $3941.44 Others: Execution on Judgment is stayed provided that Defendants make payments of $50.00 per month commencing on May 15, 2014 on continuing on the 15th day of each month until October 15, 2014 when payments will increase to $150.00 per month and to continued on the 15th day of each month thereafter until April 15, 2015 when Defendants will pay $900.00 and then resume at $150.00 per month commencing on May 15, 2015 and to continued on the 15th day of each month thereafter until paid in full. The Stay of Execution shall not prevent Plaintiff from recording an Abstract of Judgment in any county within the State of California and Plaintiff may accelerate the Judgment balance in the event Defendants make any transaction of real property. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forwarded to: 401 ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt CLCE337180.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • Stipulation for judgment- Comment: Stipulation for judgment with Stay of Execution filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • Stipulation and Order- Comment: Stipulation for Judgment with stay of execution taken. ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Case Management Conf Minutes- Comment: Case set for trial: Court Trial: Set for 06/25/2014 at 8:30am in Dept 401 Time estimate: 2 Hours csp

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for California Business Bureau Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # 325509 California Business Bureau, Inc. $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for California Business Bureau Inc.: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: California Business Bureau Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial info for Wheatley, Sean D.: Counter Payment Receipt # 329901 Wheatley, Sandra Marie $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial info for Wheatley, Sean D.: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial: Wheatley, Sean D.; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial info for Wheatley, Sandra Marie: Counter Payment Receipt # 329901 Wheatley, Sandra Marie $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial info for Wheatley, Sandra Marie: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial: Wheatley, Sandra Marie; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less