This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:14:27 (UTC).

California Business Bureau vs. Lisa T. Tatum/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 California Business Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lisa T Tatum/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2089

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Business Bureau Inc.

Defendants

Tatum, Lisa T.

Tatum, Leevel

Other

Tatum, Leevel, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Love, Franklin J.

800 South Barranca Ave #100

Covina, CA 91723

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: California Business Bureau Inc.; Tatum, Lisa T.; Tatum, Leevel; Tatum, Leevel, JR; Comment: with prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: California Business Bureau Inc.; Tatum, Lisa T.; Tatum, Leevel; Tatum, Leevel, JR; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conditional Settlement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2015
  • Case Restored to Court's Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Notice of CRC 225 Hrng Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 14-APR-2014 by CPRENDERGAST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Conditional Settlement Reached- Comment: Conditional settlement reached and filed as to entire case . Projected completion date: 6/30/2015 csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Leevel Tatum aka Leevel J. Tatum, Jr. on 1-26-14 mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of diligence filed. mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of mailing filed. mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Leevel Tatum, mailed on 1-27-14 mmm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325310.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . MM Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less