Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:25:07 (UTC).

California Business Bureau vs. David Tecomulapa/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 California Business Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against David Tecomulapa/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2091

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Business Bureau Inc.

Defendant

Tecomulapa, David

Other

Tecumulata, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Love, Franklin J.

800 South Barranca Ave #100

Covina, CA 91723

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: California Business Bureau Inc.; Tecomulapa, David; Tecumulata, David; Comment: with prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: California Business Bureau Inc.; Tecomulapa, David; Tecumulata, David; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conditional Settlement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Case Restored to Court's Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • Notice of CRC 225 Hrng Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 28-FEB-2014 by CPRENDERGAST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Conditional Settlement Reached- Comment: Conditional settlement reached and filed as to entire case filed. Projected completion date: 08/30/2015. dismissal hearing set for 10/26/2015 at 1:00pm in Room 104 csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: (BY FAX) Declaration of Mailing filed. 022814 jmo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Diligence filed. 022814 jmo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Irma Tecomulapa, mailed on 1/28/14. 022814 jmo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325314.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . MM Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less