This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/12/2022 at 17:55:46 (UTC).

Cal LeDuc vs General Motors Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/11/2013 Cal LeDuc filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against General Motors Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, McGuire, Rosemary, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3811

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

McGuire, Rosemary

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LeDuc, Cal

Abby, Tori

Abby, Miley

Jobe, Mandy

LeDuc, Lukus

LeDuc, Jay

Defendants

Toyota Motor Corporation

TRW Automotive GMBH

TRW Canada Limited

Guerrero, Mario Alberto

Canchola, Daniel M

Guerra Produce

General Motors LLC

New United Motor Manufacturing, Inc.

TRQSS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cornwell, Stephen R.

Cornwell & Sample 7045 N. Fruit Ave.

Fresno, CA 93711

Defendant Attorneys

McCarthy, Ryan

Mason, Gregory S.

Cooper, Joseph D., SR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

LeDuc - Dismissal.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice Filed

NOE NUMMI et al Ex Parte for OST re GFS.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order re Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, New United Motor Manufacturing, Inc. and General Motors LLC's Ex Parte Applicaton for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion For Judicial Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Trial brief filed

Trial Brief

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Ex Parte Application Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion for Good Faith Settlement

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark

Trial brief filed

Trial Brief Of Defendants, Mario Alberto Guerra, Guerra Prod; Comment: Trial Brief Of Defendants, Mario Alberto Guerra, Guerra Produce, And Daniel Canchola

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Modify Order on Minor's Compromise; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Stephen R. Cornwell.

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Stephen R. Cornwell

Notice to Dispose Exhibits Sent

07/13/2021: Notice to Dispose Exhibits Sent

Statement

07/16/2018: Statement

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

05/03/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

04/27/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration

04/18/2018: Declaration

Minute Order Attachment

04/17/2018: Minute Order Attachment

Civil Document

02/22/2018: Civil Document

Reply

02/14/2018: Reply

Notice of Entry of Order

01/22/2018: Notice of Entry of Order

271 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOrder Signed and Filed; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Comment: Order: Order to Destroy Exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Dispose Exhibits Sent; Comment: Recipient: Cal LeDuc C/O Stephen Cornwell 7045 N. Fruit Ave Fresno, CA 93711 General Motors Corp Bowman & Brooke LLP 1741 Technology Drive Suite 200 San Jose, CA 95110

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement filed; Comment: Receipt & Acknowledgement of Order for Deposit of Money into Blocked Account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketSettled Case Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: LeDuc, Cal; Abby, Tori; Abby, Miley; Jobe, Mandy; LeDuc, Lukus; LeDuc, Jay; Guerrero, Mario Alberto; Canchola, Daniel M; Guerra Produce; Comment: With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Joseph Cooper

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketPetition - Comp Minor's Claim; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Court Order; Comment: Stephen Cornwell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
546 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2013
  • FinancialFinancial: LeDuc, Cal; Total Financial Assessment $2,168.90; Total Payments and Credits $2,168.90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketAppointment guardian ad litem; Comment: Petition and order for appointment of guardian ad litem appointing Tori Abby as guardian ad litem for minor(s) Miley Abby signed by Judge K.Culver Kapetan on 12-11-13 . ks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketDeclaration filed; Comment: Declaration of Cal LeDuc in support of survivor action filed. le

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Order: App and Order for appointment of guard ad litem and summons Forwarded to: Dept 403 le (Order signed 12-11-13; Summons issued 12-16-13; Conformed copies placed in runner box 12-16-13) ks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Mgnt Conf; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 11-DEC-2013 by LESPARZA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Mgnt Conf; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 11-DEC-2013 by LESPARZA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE184973.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: le Event: Civil complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet le

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

CORNWELL & SAMPLE LLP

7045 N. Fruit Avenue Fresno, CA 93711

Stephen R. Cornwell, CA Bar #40737 (SPACE BELOW FOR FILING STAMP ONLY) Catherine M. Houlihan, CA Bar #312113

CORNWELL & SAMPLE, LLP

Attorneys at Law E-FILED

7045 N. Fruit Avenue 02/23/2017

|Fresno, CA 93711-0761 | Telephone: (559) 431-3142 FRES Ngy:CI\C}Ilng\gnYcfielle”ng)gt@ COURT

Facsimile: (559) 436-1135

Richard A. Belardinelli, CA Bar #65168

GEORGESON AND BELARDINELLI

7060 N. Fresno Street, Suite 250

Fresno, CA 93720

Telephone: (559) 447-8800

Facsimile: (559) 447-0747

Mark P. Robinson, Jr., CA Bar #54426

ROBINSON CALCAGNIE ROBINSON

SHAPIRO DAVIS, INC.

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

CENTRAL DIVISION

CAL LeDUC; TORI ABBY; MILEY ABBY, a minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem TORI ABBY; MANDY JOBE; LUKUS LeDUC; JAY LeDUC; and CAL LeDUC as successor in interest to the estate of Marsha Kay LeDuc

Plaintiffs,

CASE NO.: 13 CE CG 03811 MWS

GENERAL MOTORS LLC; TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION; NEW UNITED MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INC.; TRQSS, INC. (F/K/A QUALITY SAFETY SYSTEMS COMPANY); TRW

AUTOMOTIVE GMBH (F/K/A TRW

GmbH; F/K/A TRW Repa GmbH) TRW CANADA LIMITED;

MARIO ALBERTO GUERRA; DANIEL M. CANCHOLA; GUERRA PRODUCE;

and DOES 1 to 50, inclusive, )

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Date: March 7, 2017 Time: 3:30 p.m.

) ) ) ) ) ,) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) % ) Dept.: 501 )

) ) ) ) ) ,) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) % ) Dept.: 501 ) Defendants. )

Defendants. )

TO DEFENDANTS AND THEIR COUNSELS OF RECORD:

Notice is hereby given that on March 7, 2017, at 3:30 p.m., or as soon thereafter as the matter can be heard in Department 501 of this Court, located at 1130 “O” Street, Fresno, CA 93721, Plaintiffs will move the Court for Leave to file a Third Amended Complaint, pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure §§ 437 and 576.

In compliance with California Rule of Court, Rule 3.1324, the allegations to be added to Plaintiffs’ previous Complaint as set forth in bold print on the proposed Third Amended Complaint. Allegations to be removed from Plaintiffs previous Complaint have strikethrough on the proposed Third Amended Complaint.

The motion will be made on the grounds that the Third Amended Complaint is necessary for the interest of justice and the furtherance of efficiency. This motion will be based on this Notice of Motion and Motion, the Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declarations of Stephen R. Cornwell, as served and filed herewith, the records and file

herein, and on such evidence as may be presented at the hearing of the motion.

DATED: February 2 Zz , 2017. CORNWELL & SAMPLE, LLP

Stephen R. Cornwell

Catherine M. Houlihan Attorneys for Plaintiffs CAL LeDUC; TORI ABBY; MILEY ABBY, a minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem TORI ABBY; MANDY JOBE; LUKUS LeDUC; JAY LeDUC; and CAL LeDUC as successor in interest to the estate of Marsha Kay LeDuc

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRW AUTOMOTIVE GMBH is a litigant

Latest cases where New United Motor Manufacturing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Toyota Motor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant