This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:21:18 (UTC).

Cach vs Leana Splettstoesser/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Cach filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Leana Splettstoesser/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2137

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cach LLC

Defendant

Splettstoesser, Leana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vos, Ryan E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. hf Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of mailing filed. ks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of diligence filed. ks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Ashly Doe, mailed on 1-17-14 . ks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325627.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed JL Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Venue filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: JL Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less