This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/26/2018 at 20:49:41 (UTC).

CACH, LLC vs Mike Swank/JU

Case Summary

On 07/22/2011 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mike Swank/JU. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0876

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

Swank, Mike

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vos, Ryan E.

 

Court Documents

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $ 14,963.90

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $ 14,963.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Comment: Costs: $ 0 Credit: $ 0 Interest: $ 4,253.43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Notice of change of address- Comment: Notice of change of address of PATY, Madarich Law Group, LLP . BED 02/23/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 10/04/12 for plaintiff CACH, LLC against defendant Mike Swank in the sum of: Principal: $8600.76 Interest: $ 259.60 Atty Fees: $ 1540.11 Costs: $ 285.00 Total: $10,685.47 cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration pursuant to code of civil procedure 1033; Declaration in support of calculation of accrued interest and attorneys fees; Declaration RE: Accepting copies in lieu of originals; Declaration in support of default judgment pursuant to CCP 585(d) filed. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of does 1 through 10 inclusive defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Mike Swank. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: clerks judgment. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Mike Swank on 8-5-11 psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL35663.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-51819 CACH, LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.