This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:15:14 (UTC).

CACH, LLC vs. Maria Perez/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria Perez/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2100

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

Perez, Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vos, Ryan E.

Mandarich Law Group, Llp 6301 Owensmouth Ave, Ste 850

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • Case Restored to Court's Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • Bankruptcy documents filed- Comment: Bankruptcy documents filed. Judgment entered on 04/03/2014 csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 4/3/14 for plaintiff CACH LLC against defendant Maria Perez in the sum of: Principal: $4,629.87 Interest: $ 17.78 Atty Fees: $ 925.97 Costs: $ 241.00 Total: $5,814.62 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Court orders- Comment: Court orders granting use of copies in lieu of originals by Judge Cabrera. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Maria Perez hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/clerk's judgment sef

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Diligence filed. csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on "John Doe" refused to give name and, mailed on 01/23/2014 . csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Filed proof service by mail- Comment: Proof of mail by mail on 01/23/2014after subsitute service. csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE325496.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of venue filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. MM Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less