This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:15:42 (UTC).

CACH, LLC vs. David L Wiley/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against David L Wiley/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2107

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

Wiley, David L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vos, Ryan E.

Mandarich Law Group, Llp 6301 Owensmouth Ave, Ste 850

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. mn Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to David L Wiley clerk judgment not processed case dismissed on 4/23/14 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re: accepting copies in lieu of originals filed hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration in support of default judgment pursuant to ccp 585(d) filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration pursuant to code of civil procedure 1033 filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration in support of calculation of accrued interest and attorney's fees filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on David L. Wiley on 1/12/14. 013114 jmo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325479.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of venue filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # 325479 CACH, LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less