This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 17:16:33 (UTC).

CACH, LLC v Bobbie Fellows

Case Summary

On 04/04/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bobbie Fellows. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0372

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

Fellows, Bobbie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mandarich, Chris D.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 6930.11

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: judgment entered.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 1797.26

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 6930.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal Not Entered- Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: judgment entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 1797.26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Notice of change of address- Comment: Notice of change of address of PATY, Mandarich Law Group, LLP. BED 02/24/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 1/4/13 for plaintiff CACH LLC against defendant Bobbie Fellows in the sum of: Principal: $3,881.16 Interest: $ 149.46 Atty Fees: $ 776.23 Costs: $ 301.00 Total: $5,107.85 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • Order filed- Comment: Order accepting copies in lieu of originals signed by Judge Cabrera filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/ Judgment ms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Bobbie Fellows hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2012
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Mark, Co-Resident, mailed on 5/21/12. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Non Service filed. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCL38576.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00031161 ABC Legal Services, Inc. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less