This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 04:12:22 (UTC).

CACH, LLC v A Q Luong

Case Summary

On 04/11/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A Q Luong. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0416

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

Luong, A Q

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mandarich, Chris D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • Return filed- Comment: Return of Writ Issued partially Satisfied filed. Remaining to satisfy this writ $58.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Satisfaction of judgment-full- Comment: Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE303786.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of San Bernardino in the amount of $4026.83 . lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0 Interest: $95.26 Costs: $0 lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 1/3/13 for plaintiff CACH LLC against defendant A Q Luong in the sum of: Principal: $2,601.13 Interest: $ 484.22 Atty Fees: $ 520.22 Costs: $ 301.00 Total: $3,906.57 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Court orders- Comment: Court orders re: accepting copies in lieu of originals by Judge Cabrera hf .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/ judgment ja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to A Q Loung hf

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re: accepting copies in lieu of originals filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • Summons & comp - substituted- Comment: Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on Maker, mother co-resident by substituted service, mailed on 05/14/12 . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Non Service on A Q Luong filed. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCL38631.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration in support of reduced filing fee filed. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of venue filed. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less