This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:56:21 (UTC).

Brian M. Kenner vs. Oak Harbor Freight

Case Summary

On 03/26/2014 Brian M Kenner filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Oak Harbor Freight. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, Simpson, Alan, Snauffer, Mark W and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0873

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Simpson, Alan

Snauffer, Mark W

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenner, Brian M

Defendant

Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hollis, Graham S. P.

Gram Hollis Apc 3555 5Th Avenue

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant Attorney

Johnson, Kenneth E.

 

Court Documents

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing Forwarded to: Dept. 501 Proposed judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached

Notice Filed

18482-19185[2017-10-18 10-11-43].pdf; Comment: Plaintiffs Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Proof of Service

POS.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Stipulation Filed

2017 01 04 Stip for Filing Extension re MPA.pdf; Comment: STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION FOR FILING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Proof of Service

POS to FAC.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Deposit, payment,disbursment

2016 11 17 PGN-62 Deposit Complex Payment.pdf; Comment: Complex Designation

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 501 Order for: continue status conference Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing

Judgment

Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Party Names: Kenner, Brian M; Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc.; Snauffer, Mark W; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Kenner, Brian M; Judgment Amount: $1,850,000.00; Awarded Against:; Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc.

Proof of Service

POS.pdf

Notice Filed

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Comment: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Proof of Service

POS.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Order Received for Signature

2017 05 22 Amended Proposed Order re MPA.pdf; Comment: Forwarded to Dept 503 Order for: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Forwarded to 4th Floor Clerk's office for further processing

Proof of Service

POS.pdf

Stipulation Filed

2017 01 27 Stip. re Request for Ext.pdf; Comment: Requesting Extension for Filing Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

Order Received for Signature

2017 01 09 [Proposed] Order re MPA Hrg.pdf; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 501 Order for: Proposed Order Granting Continuance of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

Notice of Motion

(1) 2016 10 31 Notice of MPA.pdf; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Party Names: Kenner, Brian M; Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Kenner, Brian M; Judgment Amount: $1,850,000.00; Awarded Against:; Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- POS.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- Judgment; Comment: Signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing Forwarded to: Dept. 501 Proposed judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Minute Order/ Order After Hearing/ Tentative Ruling ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( ) . Parties served: ( )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Civil Document; Comment: attached Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter- Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Greta Gregory

    Read MoreRead Less
151 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2016
  • Financial info for Kenner, Brian M: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial info for Kenner, Brian M: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-53947 Kenner, Brian M $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial info for Kenner, Brian M: Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Financial info for Kenner, Brian M: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-49501 Kenner, Brian M $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Financial info for Kenner, Brian M: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Financial info for Kenner, Brian M: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00004602 Sacramento Legal Support, Inc. $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Financial info for Kenner, Brian M: Transaction Assessment $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Financial info for Kenner, Brian M: Counter Payment Receipt # 188545 Kenner, Brian M $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Financial info for Kenner, Brian M: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Financial: Kenner, Brian M; Total Financial Assessment $1,746.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,746.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

DEC Z 1 2016 ERESNO COUNTY SUPERIGR COURT

y DEPT. 501

RECEIVED VIA E-FILE 12/19/2016 FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

By: S. Lopez, Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF FRESNO

BRIAN M. KENNER, individually and on behalf of Similarly Situated Employees and All Aggrieved Employees of Defendant Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc.,

Plaintiff, VS. OAK HARBOR FREIGHT LINES, INC., a

Corporation, and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive, ~ :

Defendants.

Case No. 14 CECG00873 MWS

] ORDER GRANTING EROPOSED STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Judge: Honorable Mark W. Snauffer Dept.: Dept. 501

Action Filed: March 26, 2014 Trial Date: None Set

Having read and considered the forgoing stipulation, the Court hereby orders that Plaintiff may file

the First Amended Complaint provideéd in the Parties’ Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

puee: _[Z[27//4

JUDGE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT