This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 13:34:56 (UTC).

Breckenridge Group, LLC vs. Ruby Delao

Case Summary

On 11/21/2016 Breckenridge Group, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ruby Delao. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Gamoian, Lisa and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9340

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Breckenridge Group, LLC

Defendants

Delao, Rita

Delao, Ruby

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hrdlicka, Steven R

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Breckenridge Group, LLC; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against:; Delao, Ruby; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,305.00; Holdover Damages: $713.30; Attorney Fees: $950.00; Costs: $460.00; Total: $3,428.30

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Breckenridge Group, LLC; All Occupants; Delao, Ruby; Delao, Rita; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Breckenridge Group, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 335 E. Barstow Ave #2801-B Fresno CA 93710; Awarded Against:; Delao, Ruby

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Delao, Rita; Comment: Dismissal to include all DOES 1 to 10

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract; Comment: Amount: $3,428.30

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $3,683.01

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $229.71

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Premises Only

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default; Comment: Entered as to:

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Ruby Delao

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Breckenridge Group, LLC; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against:; Delao, Ruby; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,305.00; Holdover Damages: $713.30; Attorney Fees: $950.00; Costs: $460.00; Total: $3,428.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Breckenridge Group, LLC; All Occupants; Delao, Ruby; Delao, Rita; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Breckenridge Group, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 335 E. Barstow Ave #2801-B Fresno CA 93710; Awarded Against:; Delao, Ruby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Delao, Rita; Comment: Dismissal to include all DOES 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract; Comment: Amount: $3,428.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $3,683.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $229.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Financial info for Breckenridge Group, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-56994 Breckenridge Group, LLC $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Financial info for Breckenridge Group, LLC: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Financial info for Breckenridge Group, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00040416 Hrdlicka, Steven R $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Financial info for Breckenridge Group, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Financial info for Breckenridge Group, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00038626 Hrdlicka, Steven R $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Financial info for Breckenridge Group, LLC: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Financial: Breckenridge Group, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $315.00; Total Payments and Credits $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.