This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:14:00 (UTC).

Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee vs. Clifton Ohman

Case Summary

On 06/20/2016 Boston Private Bank Trust Company, as Co-Trustee filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Clifton Ohman. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1982

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee

Menon, Linda

Co-Trustees of the Anne Roberts Kempees Trust and The Edward and Madeline Roberts Nimcrut, Both Under The Edward and Madeline Roberts Trust Dated April 5, 1982

Defendants

Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association

Ohman, Clifton W.

Sterling Bank

Chicago Title Company

Successor Trustee of the Estate of Charles H. Packer

successor-in-interest to Sterling Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wailes, W George

Toledo, Elizabeth M.

Defendant Attorneys

Welin, Craig A

Rankin, Ann

Cason, Laura D.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement - Ohman.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and Assingment of Judge for all Purposes.

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee; Ohman, Clifton W.; Menon, Linda; Sterling Bank; Chicago Title Company; Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association; Comment: with prejudice

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Sterling Bank

Substitution of Attorney Filed

MENON.pdf; Comment: Old Attorney: W. George Wailes New Attorney: Elizabeth M. Toledo, Bar #: 312652

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (As to remaining properties at issue - APN 487-070-54 and APN 487-091-23/24. with prejudice.)

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

DBoston.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

BostonRFD.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

2016-08-22 Notice of Pendency.pdf; Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: waivering Defendant Comerica Bank Successor-In-Interest to Sterling Bank's attendance at the case management conference and participation in mediation

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons on Clifton W. Ohman; Comment: Clifton W. Ohman

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

BostonNotice.pdf

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Order Received for Signature

2016-10-21 Stipulation.pdf; Comment: (Order signed; Forwarded to Clerks office for further processing) PENDING REVIEW Forward to Dept : 403 Order for : STIPULATION AND ORDER WAIVING DEFENDANT, COMERICA BANK, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO STERLING BANK'S ATTENDANCE AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PARTICIPATION IN MEDIATION

Order Received for Signature

Stip&Order Waiving Comerica Attnd.pdf; Comment: (Order signed; Forwarded to clerks office for further processing) Forwarded to: Dept 403 on 12/2/16 Order for: Stipulation waiving Comerica Bank's Attendance at court mediation hearing

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee; Ohman, Clifton W.; Menon, Linda; Sterling Bank; Chicago Title Company; Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (As to remaining properties at issue - APN 487-070-54 and APN 487-091-23/24. with prejudice.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 2 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- BNOE.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- DBoston.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- BostonNotice.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- BostonRFD.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- MENON.pdf; Comment: Old Attorney: W. George Wailes New Attorney: Elizabeth M. Toledo, Bar #: 312652

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial info for Ohman, Clifton W.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-34550 Ohman, Clifton W. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial info for Ohman, Clifton W.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial: Ohman, Clifton W.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-54270 Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Financial info for Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-48349 Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Financial info for Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Financial info for Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-25866 Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Financial info for Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Financial: Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, as Co-Trustee; Total Financial Assessment $475.00; Total Payments and Credits $475.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.