This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:22:55 (UTC).

Borges Bros., Inc, et al. vs Maria L Madril

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Borges Bros , Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Maria L Madril. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2372

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Borges Bros., Inc

5804 E Brown Ave

Fresno, CA 93727

Gamboa Dr, Jose J

Fresno, CA 93703

Defendant

Madril, Maria L

Fresno, CA 93703

Other

All American Construction

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Case returned to the warehouse- Comment: File returned to Warehouse lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 11-FEB-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Dismissed by court- Comment: Court orders action dismissed without prejudice. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Judgment for- Comment: Court orders judgment entered on 2-11-14. Dismissed in court without prejudice. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Small Claims Minute Order- Comment: Temporary Judge: J. Lambe Dept.: 97E Clerk: L. Irion Reporter: 9/13/44 Nature of Hearing: Small Claims Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Not Present Defendant: Not Present (unserved) Dismissed in Court without prejudice. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 11-FEB-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment SC- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 2-11-14 to all parties. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 8:44 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt SCCE67214.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Pltf's claim personal service- Comment: Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service . mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Pltfs claim and order filed- Comment: Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 02/11/14 at 8:45 in Dept # 97E mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less