This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/16/2022 at 20:45:12 (UTC).

Bobby Boles vs. Pervaiz Chaudhry, Medical Doctor

Case Summary

On 09/12/2017 Bobby Boles filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Pervaiz Chaudhry, Medical Doctor. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, Dalesandro, Samuel, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Negin, Stephanie, Diaz, Monica, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Cabrera, Carlos and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3155

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Dalesandro, Samuel

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Negin, Stephanie

Diaz, Monica

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Cabrera, Carlos

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Boles, Bobby

individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Jerry Boles

Defendants

Community Regional Medical Center

Disease Management Pathology Center

Branch, Dan, Registered Nurse

Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group

Chaudhry, Pervais Akhtar, Medical Doctor

Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor

Nominal Defendants

Dobbs, Denise

Scher, Darla

Chapman, Debra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nunez, Henry D.

Defendant Attorneys

White, William M.

Cachia-Riedl, Rebecca L

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement Filed

01257224.pdf

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Disqualification; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR); Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Judge Patrick O'Hara (Ret)

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Reassignment of Judge

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Case Management Statement Filed

HRG 6/24/2020 Case Management Statement; Comment: HRG 6/24/2020 Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

06/03/2022: Request for Dismissal

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

04/01/2022: CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

04/01/2022: CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

04/01/2022: CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

boles NOE dismissal.pdf

06/30/2021: boles NOE dismissal.pdf

boles dismissal.pdf

06/28/2021: boles dismissal.pdf

Boles NOE Order to Continue Trial.pdf

04/23/2021: Boles NOE Order to Continue Trial.pdf

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed

04/05/2021: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed

Proposed Order

04/01/2021: Proposed Order

157 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Boles, Bobby; Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor; Branch, Dan, Registered Nurse; Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group; Disease Management Pathology Center; Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center; Dobbs, Denise; Chapman, Debra; Scher, Darla; Comment: with prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Estimated 4-10 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummary Judgment; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Filed 2/18//21 ~ Julie Hanson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party; Names: Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor; Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group; Comment: With prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Boles, Bobby: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-51459 BOLES, BOBBY $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Boles, Bobby: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Boles, Bobby; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chaudhry, Pervaiz A., Medical Doctor is a litigant

Latest cases where Valley Cardiac Surgery Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center is a litigant