This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 09:13:58 (UTC).

Blackstone Acres, LLC vs. Marcella Quiroz Madrid

Case Summary

On 10/17/2016 Blackstone Acres, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Marcella Quiroz Madrid. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Gamoian, Lisa, Cullers, Mark and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8265

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

Cullers, Mark

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blackstone Acres, LLC

Defendants

Quiroz Madrid, Marcella

Madrid, Marcella

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hrdlicka, Steven R

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Blackstone Acres, LLC; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Quiroz Madrid, Marcella; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $438.50; Holdover Damages: $967.50; Attorney Fees: $950.00; Costs: $435.00; Total: $2,791.00

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Blackstone Acres, LLC; All Occupants; Quiroz Madrid, Marcella; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Blackstone Acres, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 2029 E. Sussex Way #101 Fresno, CA 93726; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Quiroz Madrid, Marcella

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: Determining Claim of Exemption

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0 Credit: $0 Interest: $160.36

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied as to possession only

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1 to 10 ONLY

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: Type of Document: Order to Post GRANTED as to Marcella Quiroz Madrid and to All Tenants in Possession

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro; Comment: Plaintiff

Claim of exemption and financial declaration filed.

Claim of exemption and financial declaration filed

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Confidential Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: All Occupants

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Marcella Quiroz Madrid

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Blackstone Acres, LLC; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Quiroz Madrid, Marcella; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $438.50; Holdover Damages: $967.50; Attorney Fees: $950.00; Costs: $435.00; Total: $2,791.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Blackstone Acres, LLC; All Occupants; Quiroz Madrid, Marcella; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Blackstone Acres, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 2029 E. Sussex Way #101 Fresno, CA 93726; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Quiroz Madrid, Marcella

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: Determining Claim of Exemption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro- Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro; Comment: Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Claim of Exemption- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Judy - 485-1453

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Claim of exemption and financial declaration filed.- Claim of exemption and financial declaration filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Confidential Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Claim of Exemption Notice of Hearing and Opposition filed- Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $2,976.36

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • Financial info for Blackstone Acres, LLC: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Financial info for Blackstone Acres, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-36929 Blackstone Acres, LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Financial info for Blackstone Acres, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Financial info for Blackstone Acres, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00038612 Hrdlicka, Steven R $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Financial info for Blackstone Acres, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Financial info for Blackstone Acres, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00035319 Hrdlicka, Steven R $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Financial info for Blackstone Acres, LLC: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Financial info for Blackstone Acres, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00034838 Hrdlicka, Steven R $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Financial info for Blackstone Acres, LLC: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Financial: Blackstone Acres, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.