This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 11:12:01 (UTC).

Blackhorse LLC v Michael Dunn etal udd

Case Summary

On 02/05/2010 Blackhorse LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Michael Dunn etal udd. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0122

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blackhorse LLC

Defendant

Dunn, Michael

Others

Capital Collections, LLC

Giovannis Pizza

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Dunn, Michael

Other Attorney

Hrdlicka, Steven R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL35779.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. sal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • Assignment of judgment filed- Comment: Assignment of judgment filed assigning collection to Capital Collections, LCC the money judgment rendered in the above-entitled action in favor of judgment credittor against judgment debtor(s) named below. Judgment creditor hereby intends to transfer all judgment creditor's right, title and interest in any sums of money due by reason of the judgment to Capital Collections, LLC. sal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • Substitution of attorney filed- Comment: Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: Thomas V. Miles New atty: Steven R. Hrdlicka . sal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • Trial judgment- Comment: Court orders judgment entered for plaintiff Blackhorse LLC against defendant Michael Dunn dba Giovannis Pizza in the sum of: principal: $5,313.22 holdover: $4,258.00 costs: $366.08 attorney fees: $750.00 Total: $10,687.30 And for restitution of the premises located at 497 N. Clovis Ave. Ste., Clovis, CA 93611. Writ to issue; order signed in open court. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • Minute order Judge Fain- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Clov Clerk: V. Salazar Reporter: 11:14:35 Nature of Hearing: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL29433.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. CM

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2010
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 05-FEB-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$220.00 was made on receipt CLCL28896.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 05-FEB-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • Financial info for Dunn, Michael: Counter Payment Receipt # 29024 Dunn, Michael $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • Financial info for Dunn, Michael: Transaction Assessment $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • Financial: Dunn, Michael; Total Financial Assessment $205.00; Total Payments and Credits $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.