This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 15:49:15 (UTC).

Beneficial vs Leo Davila et al/CC

Case Summary

On 01/28/2010 Beneficial filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Leo Davila /CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Selma Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Silva, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0035

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Silva, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beneficial California Inc

Defendant

Davila, Leo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Osterman, Peter R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketSubstitution of attorney filed- Comment: Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: Bishop, White, Marshall & Weibel, PS New atty: Peter R. Osterman ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • DocketSatisfaction of judgment-full- Comment: Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • DocketSatisfaction of judgment-full- Comment: Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2012
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE286850.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2012
  • DocketWrit of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Los Angeles in the amount of $14,336.55 ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • DocketMemo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $21.30 Interest: $1960.13 Costs: $190.00 ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • DocketWrit filed partially satisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed partially satisfied in the sum of $45.30 th

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLSE9730.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. th

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • DocketOSC - 3.740 Collection Case Dispo- Original Type: OSC - 3.740 Collection Case Dispo; Judicial Officer: Silva, Phillip; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2010
  • DocketMatter set for hearing- Comment: Matter set for OSC re 3.740 Coll case dispo on 1/21/2011 at 1:30 pm in Selma. se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketCollection Case Status Decl- Comment: Collection Case Status Declaration filed. se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • DocketNotice filed- Comment: Notice of change of address and attorney name filed. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Henry Murieta, co-occupant, mailed on 03/04/2010. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$330.00 was made on receipt CLSE6916.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . sr Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • DocketNotice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Notice of Collections Case Review hearing set for 07/23/2010 at 1:30 pm in Selma. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beneficial California Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Osterman, Peter R