This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:16:37 (UTC).

Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company vs. Jason Russo

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jason Russo. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3646

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company

Defendants

Russo, Jason Paul

Russo, Amanda M.

Amanda Russo

Jason Russo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silver, Steven A.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company; Russo, Jason Paul; Russo, Amanda M.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company; Awarded Against:; Russo, Jason Paul; Russo, Amanda M.; Amount; Damages: $8,406.06; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 17.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $789.60; Attorney Fees: $1,396.25; Costs: $448.50; Total: $11040.41

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default; Comment: Forwarded back to clerks office for further processing on 12/01/2017.

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1 - 10

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: with judgment

Judgment Received

Request for Court Judgment; Comment: **pending review** Forward to Dept: D404

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Rafaela Lockridge pursuant to CCP 585

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Amanda M. Russo aka Amanda Russo

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to Amanda M. Russo

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Affidavit

Statement of Classification and Location/Venue; Comment: Plaintiff's Affidavit of Venue pursuant to California Civil Code Sections 1812.10 and or 2984.4

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company; Russo, Jason Paul; Russo, Amanda M.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company; Awarded Against:; Russo, Jason Paul; Russo, Amanda M.; Amount; Damages: $8,406.06; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 17.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $789.60; Attorney Fees: $1,396.25; Costs: $448.50; Total: $11040.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default- Request to Enter Default; Comment: Forwarded back to clerks office for further processing on 12/01/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)- Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default Received- Request for Entry of Default; Comment: with judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- Request for Court Judgment; Comment: **pending review** Forward to Dept: D404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of Rafaela Lockridge pursuant to CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: as to Amanda M. Russo aka Amanda Russo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to Amanda M. Russo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Summons and Complaint- Comment: Jason Paul Russo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit- Statement of Classification and Location/Venue; Comment: Plaintiff's Affidavit of Venue pursuant to California Civil Code Sections 1812.10 and or 2984.4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Financial info for Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-25009 Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Financial info for Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Financial: Beneficial State Bank, successor-in-interest to Finance and Thrift Company; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beneficial State Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silver, Steven A