This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 12:12:30 (UTC).

Bella Vista Estates, LP vs. General Fidelity Insurance Company a South Carolina Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/21/2015 Bella Vista Estates, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Fidelity Insurance Company a South Carolina Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Cullers, Mark, Cabrera, Carlos and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3274

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Cullers, Mark

Cabrera, Carlos

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bella Vista Estates, LP

Defendants

General Fidelity Insurance Company a South Carolina Corporation

Quanta Indemnity Company, a Colorado Corporation

North American Capacity Insurance Company, a Maryland Corporation

Financial Pacific Insurance Company, a California Corporation

Adayan, Tony, JR

Alicia, Norma

Hector, Jesse Aguilar

Cerda, Sandra

Cerda, Hector

Cerroblanco, Marissa

Delgado, Abel

Delgado, Maria

Diaz, Rene

Diaz, Monica

Garza, Beatriz

Florez, Manuel

Gomez-Solis, Jose

Guillen, Jose

Guillen, Norma

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Corzine, Ian

Wall, Jeffrey L

Defendant Attorneys

Keaster, Robert W.

HEGEN, KATHLEEN E

Vranjes, Mark

Sims, Bob

Sims, Bobby Dale, JR

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

BELLA VISTA V. GFIC - NOTICE OF CONT HEARING.pdf; Comment: Notice QUANTA INDEMNITY COMPANY, as successor by merger t0 QUANTA SPECIALTY LINES INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER HEARING

Notice Filed

Letter to the Clerk; Comment: Letter to the Clerk

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept:501 Order for:stipulation to continue respond to complaint Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Decl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day extension

Decl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day; Comment: Pursuant to CCP 430.41

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Association of Counsel-

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit on behalf of Plaintiff

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing Forwarded to Dept: 501 on 1/31/2017 Order for: Stip and Order to Continue Date to Respond to Complaint.

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration Of Kathleen E. Hegen In Support Of Defendant Quanta Indemnity Company, As Successor Bymerger To Quanta Special Ty Lines Insurance Company's Re-notice Of Continuance Of Demurrer Hearing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Defendant Quanta Indemnity Co., as successor by merger to Quanta Specialty Lines Insurance Co. Notice of Continuance of Demurrer Hearing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Ian Corzine Esq in Opposition to Demurrer

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: for jury trial and notice of posting jury fees

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Cross-Defendants Financial Pacific Insurance Company.

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Financial Pacific Insurance Company, a California Corporation; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: North American Capacity Insurance Company, a Maryland Corporation; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Demurrer- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Kathleen Heggan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- BELLA VISTA V. GFIC - DECL KEH ISO NOTICE 2.pdf; Comment: Declaration 0F KATHLEEN E. HEGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- BELLA VISTA V. GFIC - NOTICE OF CONT HEARING.pdf; Comment: Notice QUANTA INDEMNITY COMPANY, as successor by merger t0 QUANTA SPECIALTY LINES INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2016
  • Financial info for General Fidelity Insurance Company a South Carolina Corporation: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00001237 Sacramento Legal Support,Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Financial info for General Fidelity Insurance Company a South Carolina Corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Financial: General Fidelity Insurance Company a South Carolina Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $475.00; Total Payments and Credits $475.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Financial info for Bella Vista Estates, LP: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-05216 Bella Vista Estates, LP $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Financial info for Bella Vista Estates, LP: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Financial info for Bella Vista Estates, LP: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00026947 San Luis $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Financial info for Bella Vista Estates, LP: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Financial info for Bella Vista Estates, LP: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00026944 San Luis $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Financial info for Bella Vista Estates, LP: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Financial: Bella Vista Estates, LP; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.