Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 11:28:41 (UTC).

Barclays Bank Delaware vs. Michelle Tovar

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 Barclays Bank Delaware filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michelle Tovar. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0621

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barclays Bank Delaware

Defendant

Tovar, Michelle V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Millea, Amanda

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Clerk's Default Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment; Party Names: Barclays Bank Delaware; Tovar, Michelle V; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Barclays Bank Delaware; Awarded Against:; Tovar, Michelle V; Amount; Damages: $2,475.36; Costs: $294.50; Total: $2769.86

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: Copies in Lieu of Orig. documents

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: PENDING REVIEW Clerks Judgment granted 5/22/2017

Declaration Filed

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Comment: of Non-Military Service

Order Received for Signature

PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; Comment: PENDING REVIEW

Declaration Filed

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; Comment: Re: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals

Statement filed

STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT; Comment: of Evidence in Support of Entry of Default Judgment CCP585(d)

Declaration Filed

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST; Comment: Re: Interest

Declaration Filed

DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033; Comment: CCP1033

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: With Judgment Via E-file

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Statement filed

Statement of Classification and Location/Venue

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Clerk's Default Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment; Party Names: Barclays Bank Delaware; Tovar, Michelle V; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Barclays Bank Delaware; Awarded Against:; Tovar, Michelle V; Amount; Damages: $2,475.36; Costs: $294.50; Total: $2769.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: Copies in Lieu of Orig. documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default- Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- Judgment; Comment: PENDING REVIEW Clerks Judgment granted 5/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Comment: of Non-Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; Comment: PENDING REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; Comment: Re: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement filed- STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT; Comment: of Evidence in Support of Entry of Default Judgment CCP585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST; Comment: Re: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033; Comment: CCP1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default Received- Request for Entry of Default; Comment: With Judgment Via E-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement filed- Statement of Classification and Location/Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial info for Barclays Bank Delaware: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-04541 Barclays Bank Delaware $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial info for Barclays Bank Delaware: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Financial: Barclays Bank Delaware; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLEA, AMANDA