This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 11:03:41 (UTC).

Barbara Mohler vs.Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 Barbara Mohler filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Diaz, Monica, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0224

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Diaz, Monica

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohler, Barbara

Defendants

Community Medical Centers

Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Doe 1

CEP America-California

Doe 3

Moushigian, N.P., Andrea L

Doe 2

Osborne, James, Medical Doctor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Williams, Steven R.

Defendant Attorneys

Lozada, Alex A.

Canepa, Mark B.

 

Court Documents

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit in the Amount of $150.00 on behalf of Defendants CEP America-California, James Osborne, M.D., & Andrew Moushigian, N.P.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( ) . Parties served: ( )

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES (e-mail)

Demand for Jury Trial filed

Demand for Jury Trial; Comment: and Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Request; Comment: Forwarded to Dept. 501

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation Regarding ADR; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: a mediator to be agreed upon

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference

Answer Filed

Defs. CEP, Dr. Osborne & A. Moushigian's Answer to Complaint; Comment: to Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: CEP America-California

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: to Complaint naming Doe 2: James Osborne, M.D.

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: to Complaint Naming Doe 3: CEP America-California

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Fresno Community Hospital

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Mohler, Barbara; Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center; Moushigian, N.P., Andrea L; Osborne, James, Medical Doctor; CEP America-California; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Req by Both; Est time 7 - 15 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Dirk Paloutzian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal of entire action; Comment: Request for Dismissal of entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement filed- Statement; Comment: Statement of Evidence in Support of Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center's Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement filed- Separate Statement; Comment: Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities- Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-39115 Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-26921 Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Financial: Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center; Total Financial Assessment $1,085.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,085.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Financial info for Mohler, Barbara: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-39602 Mohler, Barbara $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Financial info for Mohler, Barbara: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Financial info for Mohler, Barbara: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-04174 Mohler, Barbara $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Financial info for Mohler, Barbara: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Financial: Mohler, Barbara; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.