This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:16:38 (UTC).

Barbara Bush vs Michelle Bassfield

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Barbara Bush filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Michelle Bassfield. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark and Snauffer, Mark W. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3834

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Snauffer, Mark W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bush, Barbara

Defendants

Bassfield, Michelle

Bassfield, Richard

Brassfield, Richard

Brassfield, Michelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Childs, Jerry F.

2445 Capital Street #105 Childs & Childs

Fresno, CA 93721

Bohn, Jeffrey D.

Defendant Attorney

Aharonian, Richard A.

 

Court Documents

Conditional Settlement Reached

Conditional Settlement Reached; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 3/16/16

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Lien

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Change of Handling Attorney

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Settled

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: 225 Dismissal Hearing set for 5/16/16 at 1:00pm Rm #104

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Bush, Barbara; Brassfield, Michelle; Brassfield, Richard; Snauffer, Mark W; Comment: with prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all caues of action filed. Initial filing fee paid

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Bush, Barbara; Brassfield, Michelle; Brassfield, Richard; Snauffer, Mark W; Comment: with prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all caues of action filed. Initial filing fee paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: of Lien

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: 225 Dismissal Hearing set for 5/16/16 at 1:00pm Rm #104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Conditional Settlement Reached- Conditional Settlement Reached; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 3/16/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Change of Handling Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2014
  • Financial info for Brassfield, Richard: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Financial: Brassfield, Richard; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Financial info for Brassfield, Michelle: Counter Payment Receipt # 191913 Brassfield, Michelle $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Financial info for Brassfield, Michelle: Counter Payment Receipt # 191912 Brassfield, Michelle $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Financial info for Brassfield, Michelle: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Financial info for Brassfield, Michelle: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Financial: Brassfield, Michelle; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Financial info for Bush, Barbara: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00012695 Bohn, Jeffrey D. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Financial info for Bush, Barbara: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Financial: Bush, Barbara; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less