This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/06/2022 at 23:11:35 (UTC).

Bankers Insurance Company, a Florida Corp vs. Gateway Auto Sales/Leasing Inc, a Calif Corp

Case Summary

On 08/26/2015 Bankers Insurance Company, a Florida Corp filed an Other lawsuit against Gateway Auto Sales/Leasing Inc, a Calif Corp. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2705

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bankers Insurance Company, a Florida Corp

Defendants

Gateway Auto Sales/Leasing Inc, a Calif Corp

an indiv dba Five Star Auto Sales

Fresno Auto Dealers Exchange

Lobel Financial Corp.

Samir, Haroun Beshoy

Richelieu, Jennifer

dba Five Star Auto Sales

dba Fresno Auto Dealers Exchange

A-L Financial Corp, a Calif Corp

Richelieu, Brian

Brasher's Sacramento Auto Auction, a Calif Corp

Fresno Commercial Lenders, Inc. a California Corporation

United Auto Credit Corporation, a Calif Corp

Hesham Elzaaym

dba California Auto Remarketing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Immordino, John J

Defendant Attorneys

Lobel, Gary D.

Lobel, Gary Dean

Gardner, Lincoln D.

 

Court Documents

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: As to Jennifer Richelieu Reason: Proof of Service was defective as to party listed on line 1c. The Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt does not show First Amended Complaint was mailed.

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: As to Gateway Auto Sales/Leasing,Inc. Reason: Proof of Service was defective as to party listed on line 1c. The Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt does not show First Amended Complaint was mailed.

Answer Filed

Answer Filed

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Date on line 1a is incorrect Amended Complaint was filed.

Amended Claim filed

Civil Document; Comment: Bankers Insurance Companys First Amended Interpleader Complaint file

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: re: Mtn for Discharge

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Civil Document

05/24/2017: Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

05/18/2017: Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Motion

04/25/2017: Notice of Motion

Minute Order Attachment

10/06/2016: Minute Order Attachment

Response

10/04/2016: Response

Minute Order Attachment

08/01/2016: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

07/18/2016: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

07/18/2016: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

07/01/2016: Case Management Statement Filed

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 2 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Other Petition Granted; Party; Names: Bankers Insurance Company, a Florida Corp; Gateway Auto Sales/Leasing Inc, a Calif Corp; Fresno Auto Dealers Exchange; Brasher's Sacramento Auto Auction, a Calif Corp; United Auto Credit Corporation, a Calif Corp; A-L Financial Corp, a Calif Corp; Hesham Elzaaym; Samir, Haroun Beshoy; Richelieu, Brian; Richelieu, Jennifer; Lobel Financial Corp.; Fresno Commercial Lenders, Inc. a California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: discharge of Bankers Insurance Company In Interpleader Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: re: Mtn for Discharge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketGeneral Motion; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Discharge of Bond John Immordino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bankers Insurance Company, a Florida Corp: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-21469 Bankers Insurance Company, a Florida Corp $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bankers Insurance Company, a Florida Corp: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Comment: andf motion for: Discharge

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketAnswer or Other Responsive Pleading Received; Comment: Answer received with check #855774 in the amount of $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed; Comment: on first amended complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Claim filed; Comment: Bankers Insurance Companys First Amended Interpleader Complaint file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bankers Insurance Company, a Florida Corp: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00019410 San Luis $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bankers Insurance Company, a Florida Corp: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: Bankers Insurance Company, a Florida Corp; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference set for December 28, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. dept 104---Case assigned to Judge Jeff Hamilton for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Five Star Auto Sales & Repair is a litigant

Latest cases where Gateway Auto Sales & Leasing, a Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Brashers Sacramento Auto Auction Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Fresno Commercial Lenders is a litigant