This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 18:54:18 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. vs. Karnvir Gill

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 Bank of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Karnvir Gill. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, Diaz, Monica, Cullers, Mark, Pebet, Noelle, McGuire, Rosemary and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1140

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Diaz, Monica

Cullers, Mark

Pebet, Noelle

McGuire, Rosemary

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant

Gill, Karnvir S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kennard, Robert Scott

Forbes, Jamie A.

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Karnvir S Gill DEFECTIVE: Declaration of mailing date later than date POS 010 signed.

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Bank of America, N.A.; Gill, Karnvir S; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Bank of America, N.A.; Awarded Against:; Gill, Karnvir S; Amount; Damages: $83,773.17; Costs: $519.50; Total: $84292.67

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached with certificate of mailing

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: previously entered.

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Forwarded to R.A. on 12/20/2018

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for dismissal

Writ of Execution Issued

12/13/2019: Writ of Execution Issued

Memorandum of Costs

12/12/2019: Memorandum of Costs

Request to Enter Default

12/20/2018: Request to Enter Default

Dismissal Not Entered

12/20/2018: Dismissal Not Entered

Judgment

12/20/2018: Judgment

Request for Dismissal

12/20/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration

12/20/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/20/2018: Declaration

Request for Entry of Default

12/20/2018: Request for Entry of Default

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bank of America, N.A.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-98455 Bank of America, N.A. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bank of America, N.A.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Santa Clara Amount: $84,317.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names: Bank of America, N.A.; Gill, Karnvir S; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Bank of America, N.A.; Awarded Against; Gill, Karnvir S; Amount; Damages: $83,773.17; Costs: $519.50; Total: $84292.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: previously entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received; Comment: Forwarded to R.A. on 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default Received; Comment: With Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 04/17/2018; Comment: Not a defective proof per management

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Karnvir S Gill Not a defective proof per management

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC/CJAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bank of America, N.A.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-23803 Bank of America, N.A. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bank of America, N.A.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Bank of America, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $460.00; Total Payments and Credits $460.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-C-001

SHORT TITLE: CASE NUMBER:

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. v. KARNVIR S GILL, et al.

4. (Continued) : : : , . b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [ X ] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 1 - 5 were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) [ X ] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 6 - 10 are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

c. [ ] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [ ] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5. [ ] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [ ] plaintiff has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [ ] plaintiff is excused from complying because (specify):

6. [ ] This action is subject to [ ] Civil Code section 1812.10 [ ] Civil Code section 2984 4.

7. This court is the proper court because a. [ X ] a defendant entered into the contract here. b.[ ]a defendant lived here when the contract was entered into. c. [ X ] a defendant lives here now. d.[ ]the contract was to be performed here. e. [ ]adefendant is a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. f. [ ]real property that is the subject of this action is located here. g. [ X] other (specify). Plaintiff is informed and believes that the Defendant(s) resided within this jurisdiction and venue at the time of the commencement of the within action or, alternatively, entered into the agreement which is the subject of this action in this jurisdiction and venue. 8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): | [ ]Breach of Contract

[ X] Common Counts [ ] Other (specify):

9. [ X ]1Other allegations: Prior to commencement of this action, tlie Defendants nerze informed in writing that if an action were commenced, the Plaintiff may recover its court costs, where allowed by law, 1n addition to the principal otherwise owed.

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. [X]damagesof$ 83,773.17 b. [ ]interestonthe damages (1) [ ]according to proof

(2) [ 1 atthe rate of (specify): percent per year from (date): c. [ ]attorney fees (1) [ Jof:$

(2) [ ]according to proof. - d. [ ]other (specify):

11.[ ] The paragrapis of this pleading alleged on information a d belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers): Date: S atfi %@ _ T |

ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

(If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verifica‘tion. )

A s = -

Sar =zo

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORBES JAMIE ALLISON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard