This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/16/2018 at 02:51:21 (UTC).

Baldemar Molina vs.Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Case Summary

On 09/06/2016 Baldemar Molina filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2906

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Molina, Baldemar

Defendants

Jackson, PA-C, Dina

Burrows, Susan, Medical Doctor

Hatcher, Gary, Medical Doctor

Fresno Community Hospital dba Community Regional Medical Center

Concentra Occupational Medical Centers - CA

Community Regional Medical Center

Gary Hatcher, D.O.

Barrows, Susan, Medical Doctor

Dina Jackson, PA-C

Concentra Health Services, Inc.

Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fanucchi, Edward L.

Defendant Attorneys

Salinas, Richard S

Ball, Michael F.

Leaf, Abigail R.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center; Awarded Against:; Molina, Baldemar; Comment: Plaintiff shall take nothing

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Declaration Filed

Declaration of Dr. Utecht; Comment: Declaration of Dr. Utecht

Notice of Motion

Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication; Comment: Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: to Complaint.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference set for January 3, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. dept 104--- Case Assigned to Judge Jeff Hamilton for all purposes

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Judgment Received

Proposed Order; Comment: Judgment signed and issued. FF to clerks office 08/02/2017, for further processing. Forward to: dept 402 on 8/1/17

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: re: Summary Judgment

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: non-opposition to defendants MSJ

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: designation of trial attorney

Notice Filed

Notice

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit on behalf of Defendant

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Concentra Occupational Medical Centers - CA; Hatcher, Gary, Medical Doctor; Dina Jackson, PA-C; Comment: With prejudice; as to Defendants Concentra Health Services, Inc.(Incorrectly named as Concentra Occupational Medical Centers-CA), Gary Hatcher, D.O.(incorrectly names as Gary Hatcher, M.D.) and Dina Jackson, PA-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Barrows, Susan, Medical Doctor; Awarded Against:; Molina, Baldemar; Comment: PARTIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center; Awarded Against:; Molina, Baldemar; Comment: Plaintiff shall take nothing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 7-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Jerry Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2016
  • Financial info for Concentra Health Services, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Financial: Concentra Health Services, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-12782 Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-43618 Fresno Community Hospital dba Community Regional Medical Center $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Financial: Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center; Total Financial Assessment $1,085.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,085.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Financial info for Molina, Baldemar: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-39753 Molina, Baldemar $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Financial info for Molina, Baldemar: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Financial: Molina, Baldemar; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less