This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:30:46 (UTC).

Atlas General Insurance Services, LLC vs.Moya Farm Labor, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 Atlas General Insurance Services, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Moya Farm Labor, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0393

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Atlas General Insurance Services, LLC

managing agent for Torus National Insurance Company

Valley Regional Insurance Services Inc., a corporation

Torus National Insurance Company, a corporation

now known as Starstone National Insurance Company

a limited liability company

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Moya Ranch, LLC

Moya Farm Labor, Inc.

Moya Ranches, LLC

Moya Farm Labor Inc. a corporation

AKA Moya Ranches, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Pollak, Robert L.

Finestone, Stephen D

Gonzalez, Jose R

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Campagne, Thomas E.

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: to Complaint

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Jose R. Gonzalez in support of Demurrer

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached Order After Hearing/ Tentative Ruling

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and motion for: order compelling answers to special interrogatories, set one and request for monetary sanctions

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Statement filed

Separate Statement; Comment: Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts

Answer Filed

Answer to 2d Am Cross-Complaint.pdf; Comment: to second amended cross-complaint

Declaration Filed

Declaration Admitted Dec; Comment: of Eric M. Kapigian in support of plaintiffs motion that requests be deemed admitted and for monetary sanctions

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Admitted; Comment: in support of plaintiffs motion that requests be deemed admitted and for monetary sanctions

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement - 6.5.17

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Form Rogs; Comment: in support of motion for order compelling answers to form interrogatories and for monetary sanctions

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Sub of Attorney - executed.pdf; Comment: Old Attorney: Robert L Pollak New Attorney: Ste[hen D. Finestone Bar#125675

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and motion for: order compelling answers to requests for production of documents, set one and request for monetary sanctions.

Demurrer Filed

Demurrer; Comment: to First Amended Cross-Complaint. Hearing set for 7-13-17 at 3:30pm Dept 501

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint; Comment: 1st Cross Complaint

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: CRC 225 Dismissal Order; Party Names: Atlas General Insurance Services, LLC; Moya Farm Labor, Inc.; Moya Ranch, LLC; Moya Farm Labor Inc. a corporation; Moya Ranch, LLC; Valley Regional Insurance Services Inc., a corporation; Torus National Insurance Company, a corporation; Atlas General Insurance Services, LLC; Comment: No parties having appeared this case is dismissed without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Comment: (As to 1st Cross-Defendant, Valley Regional Insurance Services, Inc.); Party Name: Valley Regional Insurance Services Inc., a corporation; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Req by all; Est time 3 - 5 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Eric Kapigian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 225 on July 9, 2018 at 1:00 PM in Conference Room 305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Notice of settlement of entire case

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • Financial info for Moya Ranch, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Financial: Moya Ranch, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $935.00; Total Payments and Credits $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Financial info for Moya Farm Labor, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-22170 Moya Farm Labor, Inc. $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Financial info for Moya Farm Labor, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Financial info for Moya Farm Labor, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-01232 Moya Farm Labor, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Financial info for Moya Farm Labor, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Financial: Moya Farm Labor, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $675.00; Total Payments and Credits $675.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Financial info for Atlas General Insurance Services, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-06611 Atlas General Insurance Services, etc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Financial info for Atlas General Insurance Services, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Financial: Atlas General Insurance Services, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.