Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/03/2018 at 11:18:32 (UTC).

Asset Acceptance vs Helen Ayala/DIS

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 Asset Acceptance filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Helen Ayala/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2701

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Asset Acceptance, LLC

Defendant

Ayala, Helen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Louie, Christine S.

Fulton, Friedman & Gullace,Llp 2151 Salvio Street, Suite W

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. rls Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Notice filed- Comment: Notice of stay of proceedings filed. msr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • Notice filed- Comment: Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed. Case dismised 10/30/2013 csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of compliance with ccp section 1033(b)(2) filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Request enter default denied- Comment: Request for entry of default filed. Default not entered as requested for the following reason: Proof of service on defendant was defective hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Exhibit filed- Comment: exhibits in support of judgment hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Proof of service-summon def.- Comment: Proof of service of summons on Helen Ayala filed showing defective service on - No signature provided. ks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE302076.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. dlm Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Decl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration Pursuant to CCP Section 395(b); Venue for Personal, Family or Household Obligations filed. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: dlm Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less