This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/02/2018 at 05:45:54 (UTC).

Asset Acceptance v Pablo Galvez

Case Summary

On 07/11/2012 Asset Acceptance filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pablo Galvez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0788

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Asset Acceptance, LLC

Defendant

Galvez, Pablo

Other

Merrill, Ann K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Merrill, Ann K.

Harris, Stelios A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Substitution of attorney filed- Comment: Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty:Fulton, Friedman & Gullace New atty: Stelios Harris kc 050914

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 2/13/13 for plaintiff Asset Acceptance LLC against defendant Pablo Galvez in the sum of: Principal: $8,210.96 Interest: $ 1,077.44 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 290.00 Total: $9,578.40 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of compliance with ccp section 1033(b)(2) filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Exhibits in support of judgment filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Pablo Galvez hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Pablo Galvez on 8/23/12. rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL39766.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration pursuant to ccp section 395(b); venue for personal, family or household obligations filed. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less