This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/02/2018 at 05:00:09 (UTC).

Ashtree Apartments vs. Price/JUDG

Case Summary

On 07/05/2012 Ashtree Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Price/JUDG. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0698

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashtree Apartments, LLC

Defendants

Price, Aaron

Thomas, Walter, JR

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hrdlicka, Steven R.

Defendant Attorney

Price, Arron

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE293463.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. ms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Returned mail-no address found- Comment: Notice of Calendar Setting returned by Post Office, no new address found for: Arron Price tca 2/12/13 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 10-OCT-2012 by KROSPIGLIOSI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • Money damages after 1169- Comment: In accordance with order signed by Judge Ikeda on 10/9/12 judgment having been previously entered pursuant to CP1169, Court orders the money damages on behalf of Ashtree Apartments, LLC against Aaron Price in the sum of: Past-due rent: $0 Holdover damages: $1,800.00 Atty Fees: $950.00 Costs: $490.00 Total: $3,240.00 Judgment as to Walter Thomas, Jr Holdover damages: $1,800.00 Costs: $490.00 Total: $2,290.00 lmw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: K. Rospigliosi Tape: 3:21:52 Nature of Hearing: Money Damages Money Damages Granted see signed order Attorney Steven Hrdlicka is sworn and testifies. The court takes jusicial notice of 3- day notice and proof of service already in the court file. Order signed on the record. Notice waived. lmw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 02:06 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Matter set for hearing- Comment: Matter set for Money Damages on 10-09-12 at 2:00 p.m. in dept # 401. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:15 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2012
  • Court Fees Waived- Comment: $225.00 (Amount of fees waived for documents filed or services provided) Specify: filing fee of Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • Order granting waiver of fees- Comment: Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 06-JUL-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 06-JUL-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL39554.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on UD Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 lmi Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less