This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 14:08:50 (UTC).

Arrow Financial Services vs. Donna K. Chapman

Case Summary

On 02/25/2010 Arrow Financial Services filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Donna K Chapman. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0249

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arrow Financial Services

Defendant

Chapman, Donna K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walsh, Mark D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2010
  • Collection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CCR scheduled for 9-9-10 PSN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed WITHOUT prejudice. PSN Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • Proof of service - not served- Comment: Proof of service of Summons & Complaint filed - party Donna K. Chapman not served. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • Proof of service - not served- Comment: Declaration of Proof of service of Donna K. chapman filed - party not served. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • Proof of service - not served- Comment: Proof of service of Summons & Complaint filed - party Donna K. Chapman not served. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Proof of service - not served- Comment: Proof of service of civil cover sheet filed - party Donna K Chapman not served. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCL29123.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • Notice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 25-FEB-2010 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.