This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 16:44:10 (UTC).

Arnulfo Gomez vs Sunrise Medical US LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2016 Arnulfo Gomez filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Sunrise Medical US LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Ikeda, Dale, Gaab, Kimberly and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1869

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Ikeda, Dale

Gaab, Kimberly

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ, ARNULFO

Defendant

SUNRISE MEDICAL US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryu, Jennifer

Defendant Attorney

Nadel, Darren E

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: Notice of entry of order

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Martin Vigodnier in Support of Defendant Sunrise Medical US LLC's Motion for Order Establishing Admissions and for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: in Support of Motion for Order Establishing Requests for Admissions Deemed Admitted and Request for Monetary Sanctions

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration

ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed

Stipulation; Comment: Not signed by: Plaintiff's Counsel Party(s) who signed: Natalie M. Jansen ADR method chosen: Def. has filed a motion to compel arbitration which will be heard January 11, 2017

Amended Document Filed

Notice; Comment: Defendant's Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Proceedings

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion for: Order Establishing Requests for Admissions Deemed Admitted and Request for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Supplemental Declaration of Kari Morris iso Defendant's MTC Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Proceedings

Stipulation for Continuance of a Hearing

Stipulation for Continuance of a Hearing; Comment: compel arbitration

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Plaintiff's Index of Exhibits

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Arnulfo Gomez

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: for Jury Fees by Plaintiff

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: General Denial /and Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: GOMEZ, ARNULFO; SUNRISE MEDICAL US LLC; Comment: SEE TENTATIVE RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Req by both parties; Est time 3-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: Notice of entry of order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Motion - Terminating Sanctions- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Alison Peirce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: Pending Until Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of Allison K. Pierce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities- Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: MPAs

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2016
  • Financial info for SUNRISE MEDICAL US LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-49518 SUNRISE MEDICAL US LLC $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Financial info for SUNRISE MEDICAL US LLC: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Financial info for SUNRISE MEDICAL US LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-35468 SUNRISE MEDICAL US LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Financial info for SUNRISE MEDICAL US LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Financial: SUNRISE MEDICAL US LLC; Total Financial Assessment $755.00; Total Payments and Credits $755.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for GOMEZ, ARNULFO: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-45996 GOMEZ, ARNULFO $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for GOMEZ, ARNULFO: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Financial info for GOMEZ, ARNULFO: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-24194 GOMEZ, ARNULFO $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Financial info for GOMEZ, ARNULFO: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Financial: GOMEZ, ARNULFO; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less