This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 07:54:17 (UTC).

Aris Janigian vs. Satyr Vapor, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 Aris Janigian filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Satyr Vapor, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Black, Donald and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3227

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janigian, Aris

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Satyr Vapor, LLC

Blueberry Wholesale

Woody, Adam

CEN Cal Vapes Wholesale

Cencal Vapes, Inc.

Doe 3

Satyr Vapor

Moe 1

Wooddy, Adam

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Blueberry Wholesale

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paboojian, Warren R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Wilkins, James H.

Lynch, Robert J

Eliason, Robert G.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Lynch, Robert J

 

Court Documents

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James A. Ardaiz

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement Filed

Cencal Vapes CMS.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Summons on Cross-Complaint (2).pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: 1st Cross-Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: allowing doe amendment to complaint

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Naming DOE 1: Adam Woody, dba Satyr Vapor

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Allowing DOE Amendment to Complaint

ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed

Stipulation; Comment: Not signed by: Roberty Lynch, Robert Eliason Party(s) who signed: Adam Stirrup, James H. Wilkins ADR method chosen: Mediation

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Tatum Hilmoe, New Attorney: Robert G. Eliason #105645

Summons issued and filed

Summons on Cross-Complaint (2).pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: 1st Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: naming Doe 2 as Cen Cal Vapes Wholesale and Doe 3 as Blueberry Wholesale

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Adam B. Stirrup in Support of Application for Order Allowing DOE Amendment to Complaint

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Adam B. Stirrup in Support of Application for Order Allowing DOE Amendment to Complaint

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 15 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of Adam B. Stirrup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: Allowing DOE Amendment to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Robert Eliason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: set by Robert Eliason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Motion to be relieved as counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be relieved as counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be relieved as counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2017
  • Financial info for Woody, Adam: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Financial: Woody, Adam; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Financial info for Satyr Vapor, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-00112 Satyr Vapor, LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Financial info for Satyr Vapor, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Financial: Satyr Vapor, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Financial info for Janigian, Aris: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-20597 Janigian, Aris $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Financial info for Janigian, Aris: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Financial info for Janigian, Aris: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-45156 Janigian, Aris $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Financial info for Janigian, Aris: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Financial: Janigian, Aris; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less