This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:22:24 (UTC).

Animal Health Int'l v Ayala Farms/JU/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Animal Health Int'l filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ayala Farms/JU/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2464

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Animal Health International Inc.

Po Box 1250

Greely, CO 80632

Defendant

Ayala Farms

Riverdale, CA 93656

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • Case returned to the warehouse- Comment: File returned to warehouse on 4/2/14 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Small Claims Minute Order- Comment: Temporary Judge: Warren Williams Dept.: 97E Clerk: L. Irion Reporter: 2/00/59 Nature of Hearing: Small Claims Court Trial Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Not Present Defendant: Hugo Montano-Safety Coordinator Plaintiff not present in Court. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 01-APR-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Pursuant CRC1727 temp judge- Comment: Pursuant to CRC 1727 (sign posted & oral notification given), the parties are deemed to have stipulated to this matter being tried by a temporary judge. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment SC- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 4/1/14 to all parties. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 01-APR-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Dismissed by court- Comment: Court orders action dismissed without prejudice. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2014
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Pltf's claim served- Comment: Plaintiff's claim returned to court served as to Ayala Farms and filed. Cost $35.00. th.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Court Trial- Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 01:29 PM; Result: Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Auth to Appear on Behalf Party- Comment: Authorization to Appear on behalf of Animal Health International Inc filed by Roger Fanjul on 2-4-14 ***Roger did not sign form Bonnie Adelman signed it***.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Reset hearing- Comment: Reset hearing of 2-13-14 tpo 4-1-14 at 1:30pm D97e ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$30.00 was made on receipt SCCE67593.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Pltf's claim personal service- Comment: Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service . Unknown Method cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 2/13/14 at 1:30 pm in Dept # 97E. cc Event: Pltf's claim & order filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less