This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 21:30:54 (UTC).

Angie Rodriguez vs. Norcal Gold Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2016 Angie Rodriguez filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Norcal Gold Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Simpson, Alan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2279

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Angie

Defendants

Norcal Gold Inc.

Parks, Joe

Risk, Kathy

Flood, Stephanie

Hayes, Nita

Kendall, Bev

RE/MAX Gold

Francis, Monica

Flood, Stephenie

Risk, Cathy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Waterman, John R.

Defendant Attorney

Farmer, Matthew E.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Rodriguez, Angie; Norcal Gold Inc.; Parks, Joe; Francis, Monica; Flood, Stephenie; Hayes, Nita; Risk, Cathy; Kendall, Bev; Comment: With Prejudice.

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: to Complaint.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Bev Kendall

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: No Declaration of Dilligence or Declaration of Mailing Attatched

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service Stephanie Flood

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service Norcal Gold

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service Kathy Risk

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: Complaint for Damages

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Rodriguez, Angie; Norcal Gold Inc.; Parks, Joe; Francis, Monica; Flood, Stephenie; Hayes, Nita; Risk, Cathy; Kendall, Bev; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: to Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Summons and Complaint- Comment: Defective Reason: Defendant's name does not match complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Summons and Complaint- Comment: No Declaration of Dilligence or Declaration of Mailing Attatched

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial: Risk, Cathy; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for Flood, Stephenie: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-05125 Flood, Stephenie $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for Flood, Stephenie: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial: Flood, Stephenie; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for Norcal Gold Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-05124 Norcal Gold Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for Norcal Gold Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial: Norcal Gold Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Financial info for Rodriguez, Angie: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-29988 Rodriguez, Angie $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Financial info for Rodriguez, Angie: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Financial: Rodriguez, Angie; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less