Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/16/2021 at 15:27:00 (UTC).

Angel Portillo vs. Community Hospitalist Medical Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2017 Angel Portillo filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Community Hospitalist Medical Group, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Gaab, Kimberly, Diaz, Monica, Black, Donald, Simpson, Alan, Tharpe, D Tyler and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4212

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

Diaz, Monica

Black, Donald

Simpson, Alan

Tharpe, D Tyler

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Portillo, Angel

by and through his Conservator, Celia Guiba

Defendants

Community Reginal Medical Center

Community Hospitalist Medical Group, Inc.

Doe 11 "Anesthesia Group"

Doe 12 "Emergency Medicine Medical Group"

Doe 13 "Surgical Group"

Wolfe, Mary, Medical Doctor

Dimitrova, Albena V, Medical Doctor

Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Doe 17

Doe 19

Sidhu, Harpreet, Medical Doctor

Beshore, Jordan, Doctor of Osteopathi

Loo, Tricia, Medical Doctor

Doe 1

Diana Lin, DMD

Doe 16

Lee, Elaine, Medical Doctor

Doe 18

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fanucchi, Edward L.

Defendant Attorneys

White, William M.

Ball, Michael F.

Salinas, Richard S

Other Attorneys

Billups-Slone, Denise

Pollara, Dominique A.

Jeffcoach, Mandy L.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Diana Lin

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Central California Faculty Medical Group

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Regents of the University of California

Amended Document Filed

Amended Document Filed; Amended Document Filed; Comment: Amended Summons

Amended Document Filed

Amended Document Filed; Amended Document Filed; Comment: Amended Summons

Amendment filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: Document: Amendment to Complaint adding Doe Defendants

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: *Department Change*

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: to Amendment to Complaint

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Adding of Doe 6

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Amendment filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: Doe 4

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: to Amendment to Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: to Amendment to Complaint

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSummary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Mandy Jeffcoach

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Jury Defendant; 6 to 12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: and Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 1:31 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
240 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Community Hospitalist Medical Group, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Mary Wolfe, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Portillo, Angel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-72264 Portillo, Angel $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Portillo, Angel: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Portillo, Angel; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wolfe, Mary M., Medical Doctor is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pollara, Dominique A.