Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/25/2020 at 22:35:04 (UTC).

Andres Limon vs. Centex Homes/COMPLEX/LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 10/05/2011 Andres Limon filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Centex Homes/COMPLEX/LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Black, Donald, Snauffer, Mark, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Dalesandro, Samuel, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Simpson, Alan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3487

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Dalesandro, Samuel

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Limon, Andres

Alfaro, Rogelio

Anaya, Joe

Anaya, Patricia

Bennett, Steven

Bennett, Rebecca

Brandt, Michael

Brandt, Jamie

Bryant, Joel

Bryant, Kelly

Cardwell, Scott

Chavez, Alvaro

Day, Eric

Day, Malikah

Dean, Sean

Dosanjh, Narinder

Dosanjh, Davinder

Franco, Bridgette

Galvan, Jamie

Galvan, Elvira

249 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adelman, Fred

Milstein Adelman, Llp 2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Staffeldt, Jonathan

Other Attorneys

Ferrentino, Joseph A

Newmeyer & Dillon 895 Dove St 5Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Ranck, Christopher C

Chen, Andy Y

Aguilera, A Eric

Schoneman, Tina L

Barrera, Gary A.

Newmeyer & Dillon 1277 Treat Blvd. Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Peel, James W.

Peel Garcia Llp 3585 W. Beechwood, #101

Fresno, CA 93711

Moak, Stacy

Freedman, Brian

Correll, Deborah A.

Shapiro, Megan A.

Heath, Stephen B.

Hebesha, Amanda G.

Leenerts, Eric M.

Taitz, Robert J

Hammons, Wallace W

Perea, Thomas V

Hazelton, M. Troy

21 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: United Specialty Insurance Company; Comment: without prejudice.; Comment: (As to Cross Defendant in 2nd Consolidated case. United Specialty Insurance company (As to policy TWCG41001003 for John Rocha Custom Tractor Service))

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal re Navigators

Association of Attorney filed

Association of Attorney/Counsel; Comment: Associated Attorney: James C. Parker

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: Faxed received 502

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Civil Document

Answer Filed

Answer Filed; Comment: to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America's 2nd Amended Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Answer Filed

Civil Document; Comment: to 2nd Amended Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: First Mercury Insurance Company; Comment: Without Prejudice.; Comment: (As to Cross Defendant from 2nd Consolidated Case)

Case Management Statement Filed

M&L Plumbing Case Management Statement.pdf

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

RFD (Centex) 1-16-17 BW FULL.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Order Received for Signature

STIPULATION REGARDING THE SUBSTITUTION AND ANSWER OF ZURICH; Comment: Signed & returned to cler's office for further processing Forwarded to Dept: 502 Stip. & Order for: Substitution and Answer of Zurich American Insurance Company as Successor by Merger to Maryland Casualty Co. and Northern Ins. Co.

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of change of fax number

Letter Received

Letter Received

Answer Filed

Answer Filed; Comment: to Second Amended Complaint of Centex Real Estate Corp

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

487 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: John Rocha Custom Tractor Service Inc; MOES 1 through 100 Inclusive; Limon, Andres; Alfaro, Rogelio; Anaya, Joe; Anaya, Patricia; Bennett, Steven; Bennett, Rebecca; Brandt, Michael; Brandt, Jamie; Bryant, Joel; Bryant, Kelly; Cardwell, Scott; Chavez, Alvaro; Day, Eric; Day, Malikah; Dean, Sean; Dosanjh, Narinder; Dosanjh, Davinder; Franco, Bridgette; Galvan, Jamie; Galvan, Elvira; Galvan, James; Galvan, Rhonda; Garcia, Lorena; Garcia, Maria; Garnica, Jose; Glenn, Clinton; Gonzales, Johnny; Gonzales, Melissa; Gonzalez, Jose; Gonzalez, Angie; Heimbuch, Kyle; Hernandez, Edward; Hernandez, Natalie; Hirata, Steven; Hirata, Joyce; Howard, Jodie; Inboon, Boualai; Howard, Robert; Lee, Kalia; Lynch, Patrick; Lynch, Felicia; Macias, Christina; Macias, Danny; Marines, Charles; Marines, Margari; Marquez, Erlinda; Marquez, Juan; Martinez, Isreal; Martinez, Linda; McQuay, Aaron; McQuay, Erin; Meador, Deborah; Meador, Jon; Medina, Irving; Medina, Margaret; Mendibles, Peter; Mendibles, Lorena; Michels, Patrick; Michels, Rosemary; Morris, Margaret; Morris, Eugene; Moua, Sue; Moua, See; Moua, Wayne; Odonnell, Carol; Ortiz, Penelope; Ortiz, Gerardo; Page, James; Page, Mercedes; Paggett, Erika; Pankratz, Luke; Pankratz, Sherry; Pierce, Matthew; Puentes, Valeria; Rai, Jasvir; Rai, Sukhjit; Rou, Paule; Sanchez, Griselda; Sandhu, Bhajan; Sandhu, Amrik; Santiago, Steven; Scharnick, Sarah; Scharnick, James; Schiotis, Jimmy; Schiotis, Katherine; Singh, Rawaljit; Straughter, Ronald; Thaites-Meister, Kari; Vang, Neng; Waghela, Truptiben; Whorton, David; Woodard, David; Centex Homes, a Nevada General Partnership; Centex Real Estate Corp.; Her, Houa; Knight, Raymond; Gerardo & Rodriguez; Tamayo, Michael; Channy & Jason Thompson; Torres, Pedro; Cherelyn & David Willet; Centex Real Estate Corporation a Nevada Corp; Centex Homes, a Nevada General Partnership; A L Drywall, a sole proprietorship; Air Design Inc, a Calif Corp; Beutler Corporation; B-F Glass Inc; Bianchi Plumbing Co., Inc, a Dissolved California Corp; Blazona Concrete Construction, Inc a Calif Corp; Blue Mountain Air Inc. a Calif Corp; Cedar Valley Concrete Corporation, a Calif Corp; Energetic Painting and Drywall Inc; F G Electric Service, a sole proprietorship. le; Fresno Precision Inc, a Calif Corp; Grant Construction Inc, A Calif. Corp; GS Cement Inc. a Calif Corp; Hard Surface Technology Inc; John Rocha Custom Tractor Service Inc, a Calif Corp; Ken Perry Tile Inc, a Calif Corporation; Kings River Door Inc a Calif. Corporation; Mulhern, Lance; M&B Carpentry, Inc., a Calif Corp; M & L Plumbing Co., Inc, a Calif Corp; Mayer Roofing Inc, a Calif. Corp; Pavletich Electric and Communications Inc; Petersen-Dean Inc, a Calif Corp; Production Framing Systems Inc., a Calif Corp; RCR Plumbing & Mechanical Inc, a Calif Corp; Sacramento Insulation Contractors, a Calif. Corp; Selectbuild Construction Inc; Sierra Glass & Screen Inc; Simas Floor Co. Inc, a Calif Corp; Talons Landscape Development Inc., a Calif Corp; C & F Enterprises Inc; Tom Besmer Construction Inc, a Calif Corp; Tri-Valley Plastering Inc, a Calif Corp; Walldesign Incorporated, a Calif. Corp; Windows By Advanced Inc., a Calif Corp; Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, a Connectic; Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, a Connecticut C; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; Kings River Door, Inc.; Roes 1 through 100; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut; Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America; Centex Real Estate Corporation; Centex Homes; Air Design, Inc.; A L Drywall; Air Design, Inc.; Beutler Corporation; B F Glass, Inc.; Bianchi Plumbing Co., Inc.; Blazona Concrete Construction, Inc.; Blue Mountain Air, Inc.; Cedar Valley Concrete Corporation; D C Plainting, a sole proprietorship; Energetic Painting and Drywall, Inc.; F G Electric Service; Fresno Precision Plastics, Inc.; Grant Construciton, Inc.; GS Cement, Inc.; Hard SurfaceTechnology, Inc.; John Rocha Custom Tractor Service, Inc.; Ken Perry Tile, Inc.; Kings River Door, Inc.; Lance Mulhern; M & B Carpentry, Inc.; Mayer Roofing, Inc.; Pavletich Electric, Inc.; Peterson-Dean, Inc.; Production Framing Systems, Inc.; RCR Plumbing & Mechanical, Inc.; Sacramento Insulation Contractors; Selectbuild Construction, Inc.; Sierra Glass & Screen, Inc.; Simas Floor Co. Inc.; Talons Landscape Development, Inc.; C L F Enterprises, Inc.; Tom Beasmer Construciton, Inc.; Tri-Valley Plastering Inc.; Walldesign Incorporated; Windows by Advanced, Inc.; Lexington Insurance Company; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA; Aig Speciality Insurance Company, Fka Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Fka American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company; The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania; Wesco Insurance Company; Rockhill Insurance Company; Old Republic Insurance Company; First Mercury Insurance Company; Navigators Specialty Insurance Company; National Fire & Marine Insurance Company; Interstate Fire &Casualty Insurance Company; Fireman's Fund Insurance Company; Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy No 618A71635013003; Maryland Casualty Company; Northern Insurance Company of New York; Zurich American Insurance Company; Financial Pacific Insurance Company; Arch specialty Insurance Company; United Specialty Insurance Company; Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company RE Policy Nos: 1-3; Fresno Precision Plastics, Inc.; Howell, Ronald; Howell, Arlene; Glenn, Sandra; Inboon, Inh; Martinez, Leopoldo; Torres, Lorena; Centex Homes; Centex Real Estate Corp., A Nevada Corporation; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company; Benchmark Insurance Company; Ken Perry Tile, Inc; American Safety Casualty Insurance Company; First American Specialty Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Insurance company; Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG; Illinois Union Insurance Company; American Safety Indemnity Company; American States Insurance Company; Chartis Specialty Insurance Company fka American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company; Gemini Insurance Company; United Contractors Insurance Company, RRG; Ace American Insurance Company; Federated Mutual Insurance Company; Aspen Specialty Insurance Company; Century Surety Company; Bankers Insurance Company; Mutual Service Casualty Insurance Company; Truck Insurance Exchange; Everest National Insurance Company; Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania; Everest National Insurance Company; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut; Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America; American States Insurance Company; Travelers Property; Travelers Indemnity Company; Travelers Casualty; Zurich American Insurance Company; Maryland Casualty Company; Northern Insurance Company of New York; Duane Coffman dba D.C Painting; BMC Construction Services; Building Materials Construction Services, Inc.; CVC Construction Corporation; DB Company; Dependable Fence, Inc.; Elite Landscaping; Fenceworks; Fresno Custom Tile; Isert-Kott, Ilene; Allied Property And Casualty Insurance Company; Contractors Insurance Company of North America, Inc., a RRG; Wesco Insurance Company; Contractors Insurance Company of North America; M & L Plumbing Co., Inc.; Limon, Andres; Alfaro, Rogelio; Anaya, Joe; Anaya, Patricia; Bennett, Steven; Bennett, Rebecca; Brandt, Michael; Brandt, Jamie; Bryant, Joel; Bryant, Kelly; Cardwell, Scott; Chavez, Alvaro; Day, Eric; Day, Malikah; Dean, Sean; Dosanjh, Narinder; Dosanjh, Davinder; Franco, Bridgette; Galvan, Jamie; Galvan, Elvira; Galvan, James; Galvan, Rhonda; Garcia, Lorena; Garcia, Maria; Garnica, Jose; Glenn, Clinton; Gonzales, Johnny; Gonzales, Melissa; Gonzalez, Jose; Gonzalez, Angie; Heimbuch, Kyle; Hernandez, Edward; Hernandez, Natalie; Hirata, Steven; Hirata, Joyce; Howard, Jodie; Inboon, Boualai; Howard, Robert; Lee, Kalia; Lynch, Patrick; Lynch, Felicia; Macias, Christina; Macias, Danny; Marines, Charles; Marines, Margari; Marquez, Erlinda; Marquez, Juan; Martinez, Isreal; Martinez, Linda; McQuay, Aaron; McQuay, Erin; Meador, Deborah; Meador, Jon; Medina, Irving; Medina, Margaret; Mendibles, Peter; Mendibles, Lorena; Michels, Patrick; Michels, Rosemary; Morris, Margaret; Morris, Eugene; Moua, Sue; Moua, See; Moua, Wayne; Odonnell, Carol; Ortiz, Penelope; Ortiz, Gerardo; Page, James; Page, Mercedes; Paggett, Erika; Pankratz, Luke; Pankratz, Sherry; Pierce, Matthew; Puentes, Valeria; Rai, Jasvir; Rai, Sukhjit; Rou, Paule; Sanchez, Griselda; Sandhu, Bhajan; Sandhu, Amrik; Santiago, Steven; Scharnick, Sarah; Scharnick, James; Schiotis, Jimmy; Schiotis, Katherine; Singh, Rawaljit; Straughter, Ronald; Thaites-Meister, Kari; Vang, Neng; Waghela, Truptiben; Whorton, David; Woodard, David; Centex Homes, a Nevada General Partnership; Centex Real Estate Corp.; Her, Houa; Knight, Raymond; Gerardo & Rodriguez; Tamayo, Michael; Channy & Jason Thompson; Torres, Pedro; Cherelyn & David Willet; Centex Real Estate Corporation a Nevada Corp; Centex Homes, a Nevada General Partnership; A L Drywall, a sole proprietorship; Air Design Inc, a Calif Corp; Beutler Corporation; B-F Glass Inc; Bianchi Plumbing Co., Inc, a Dissolved California Corp; Blazona Concrete Construction, Inc a Calif Corp; Blue Mountain Air Inc. a Calif Corp; Cedar Valley Concrete Corporation, a Calif Corp; Energetic Painting and Drywall Inc; F G Electric Service, a sole proprietorship. le; Fresno Precision Inc, a Calif Corp; Grant Construction Inc, A Calif. Corp; GS Cement Inc. a Calif Corp; Hard Surface Technology Inc; John Rocha Custom Tractor Service Inc, a Calif Corp; Ken Perry Tile Inc, a Calif Corporation; Kings River Door Inc a Calif. Corporation; Mulhern, Lance; M&B Carpentry, Inc., a Calif Corp; M & L Plumbing Co., Inc, a Calif Corp; Mayer Roofing Inc, a Calif. Corp; Pavletich Electric and Communications Inc; Petersen-Dean Inc, a Calif Corp; Production Framing Systems Inc., a Calif Corp; RCR Plumbing & Mechanical Inc, a Calif Corp; Sacramento Insulation Contractors, a Calif. Corp; Selectbuild Construction Inc; Sierra Glass & Screen Inc; Simas Floor Co. Inc, a Calif Corp; Talons Landscape Development Inc., a Calif Corp; C & F Enterprises Inc; Tom Besmer Construction Inc, a Calif Corp; Tri-Valley Plastering Inc, a Calif Corp; Walldesign Incorporated, a Calif. Corp; Windows By Advanced Inc., a Calif Corp; Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, a Connectic; Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, a Connecticut C; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; Kings River Door, Inc.; Roes 1 through 100; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut; Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America; Centex Real Estate Corporation; Centex Homes; Air Design, Inc.; A L Drywall; Air Design, Inc.; Beutler Corporation; B F Glass, Inc.; Bianchi Plumbing Co., Inc.; Blazona Concrete Construction, Inc.; Blue Mountain Air, Inc.; Cedar Valley Concrete Corporation; D C Plainting, a sole proprietorship; Energetic Painting and Drywall, Inc.; F G Electric Service; Fresno Precision Plastics, Inc.; Grant Construciton, Inc.; GS Cement, Inc.; Hard SurfaceTechnology, Inc.; John Rocha Custom Tractor Service, Inc.; Ken Perry Tile, Inc.; Kings River Door, Inc.; Lance Mulhern; M & B Carpentry, Inc.; Mayer Roofing, Inc.; Pavletich Electric, Inc.; Peterson-Dean, Inc.; Production Framing Systems, Inc.; RCR Plumbing & Mechanical, Inc.; Sacramento Insulation Contractors; Selectbuild Construction, Inc.; Sierra Glass & Screen, Inc.; Simas Floor Co. Inc.; Talons Landscape Development, Inc.; C L F Enterprises, Inc.; Tom Beasmer Construciton, Inc.; Tri-Valley Plastering Inc.; Walldesign Incorporated; Windows by Advanced, Inc.; Lexington Insurance Company; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA; Aig Speciality Insurance Company, Fka Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Fka American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company; The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania; Wesco Insurance Company; Rockhill Insurance Company; Old Republic Insurance Company; First Mercury Insurance Company; Navigators Specialty Insurance Company; National Fire & Marine Insurance Company; Interstate Fire &Casualty Insurance Company; Fireman's Fund Insurance Company; Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy No 618A71635013003; Maryland Casualty Company; Northern Insurance Company of New York; Zurich American Insurance Company; Financial Pacific Insurance Company; Arch specialty Insurance Company; United Specialty Insurance Company; Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company RE Policy Nos: 1-3; Fresno Precision Plastics, Inc.; Howell, Ronald; Howell, Arlene; Glenn, Sandra; Inboon, Inh; Martinez, Leopoldo; Torres, Lorena; Centex Homes; Centex Real Estate Corp., A Nevada Corporation; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company; Benchmark Insurance Company; Ken Perry Tile, Inc; American Safety Casualty Insurance Company; First American Specialty Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Insurance company; Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG; Illinois Union Insurance Company; American Safety Indemnity Company; American States Insurance Company; Chartis Specialty Insurance Company fka American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company; Gemini Insurance Company; United Contractors Insurance Company, RRG; Ace American Insurance Company; Federated Mutual Insurance Company; Aspen Specialty Insurance Company; Century Surety Company; Bankers Insurance Company; Mutual Service Casualty Insurance Company; Truck Insurance Exchange; Everest National Insurance Company; Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania; Everest National Insurance Company; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut; Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America; American States Insurance Company; Travelers Property; Travelers Indemnity Company; Travelers Casualty; Zurich American Insurance Company; Maryland Casualty Company; Northern Insurance Company of New York; Duane Coffman dba D.C Painting; BMC Construction Services; Building Materials Construction Services, Inc.; CVC Construction Corporation; DB Company; Dependable Fence, Inc.; Elite Landscaping; Fenceworks; Fresno Custom Tile; Isert-Kott, Ilene; Allied Property And Casualty Insurance Company; Contractors Insurance Company of North America, Inc., a RRG; Wesco Insurance Company; Contractors Insurance Company of North America; M & L Plumbing Co., Inc.; Comment: As to 1st Cross Complaint Only; Comment: (Without Prejudice)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- NOTICE REGARDING ORDE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; Comment: Regarding Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketDismissal Hearing- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Everest National Insurance Company; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut; Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America; Wesco Insurance Company; Contractors Insurance Company of North America; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment: (As to 2nd Cross Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Centex Real Estate Corp.; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut; Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America; Centex Real Estate Corporation; Centex Homes; Lexington Insurance Company; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA; Aig Speciality Insurance Company, Fka Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Fka American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company; The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania; Wesco Insurance Company; Rockhill Insurance Company; Old Republic Insurance Company; First Mercury Insurance Company; Navigators Specialty Insurance Company; National Fire & Marine Insurance Company; Interstate Fire &Casualty Insurance Company; Fireman's Fund Insurance Company; Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy No 618A71635013003; Maryland Casualty Company; Northern Insurance Company of New York; Zurich American Insurance Company; Financial Pacific Insurance Company; Arch specialty Insurance Company; United Specialty Insurance Company; Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company RE Policy Nos: 1-3; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company; Benchmark Insurance Company; Ken Perry Tile, Inc; American Safety Casualty Insurance Company; First American Specialty Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Insurance company; Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG; Illinois Union Insurance Company; American Safety Indemnity Company; American States Insurance Company; Chartis Specialty Insurance Company fka American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company; Gemini Insurance Company; United Contractors Insurance Company, RRG; Ace American Insurance Company; Federated Mutual Insurance Company; Aspen Specialty Insurance Company; Century Surety Company; Bankers Insurance Company; Mutual Service Casualty Insurance Company; Truck Insurance Exchange; Everest National Insurance Company; Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania; Allied Property And Casualty Insurance Company; Contractors Insurance Company of North America, Inc., a RRG; Comment: Without prejudice; Comment: (As to Cross Complaint 2nd Consolidated Case)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal- Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Lexington Insurance Company; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA; Aig Speciality Insurance Company, Fka Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Fka American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company; Chartis Specialty Insurance Company fka American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company; Everest National Insurance Company; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
1,073 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2011
  • FinancialFinancial info for Limon, Andres: Counter Payment Receipt # 157531 Limon, Andres $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • FinancialFinancial info for Limon, Andres: Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • FinancialFinancial: Limon, Andres; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt CVCE157531.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 05-OCT-2011 by GSAUCEDA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DocketSummons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: gs Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Freedman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRERA, GARY A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hebesha, Amanda G.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEREA THOMAS VINCENT