This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 22:22:18 (UTC).

Anchor General Insurance Co. vs. Beata Garcia Gomez

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Anchor General Insurance Co against Beata Garcia Gomez in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5807

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anchor General Insurance Co.

Defendants

Martinez, Angel

Martinez, Angel Gustavo

Gomez, Beata Garcia

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

2090582_9772830232.p; Comment: Beata Garcia Gomez

Proof of Service

2090582_073283023.pd; Comment: Angel Martinez

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC Hearing Date 10/1/2018

Summons issued and filed

2054267_719283023MAR; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

2054267_719283023MAR; Summons issued and filed

Declaration Filed

2054267_103283023MAR; Comment: of Venue

Civil case cover sheet

2054267_301283023MAR

Civil Complaint filed

2054267_924283023MAR

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Comment: Order granting continuing the Order to Show Cause from 4/26/2019 to 5/24/ 2019

Declaration Filed

2630539_408DECANDORD; Comment: RE: JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER TO CONTINUE

Dismissal Not Entered

2488846_643283023DIS; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Stay must be lifter prior to dismissal of party.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Breanne L. Reese Esq. Re: Order to Show Cause

Notice/Order of Stay as to (Party)

Notice

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without Judgment Via E-File

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: HRG 10/1/18; CMC

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: 60-Day Continued OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet- Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of Joseph M. Pleasant Esq. Re: Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Comment: Order granting continuing the Order to Show Cause from 4/26/2019 to 5/24/ 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Forwarded to Clerks Office for further processing 4/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- 2630539_408DECANDORD; Comment: RE: JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: RE: Hearing of 60 day Continued OSC 4/26/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC Hearing Date 10/1/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- 2054267_719283023MAR; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- 2054267_103283023MAR; Comment: of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- 2054267_301283023MAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- 2054267_924283023MAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Financial info for Anchor General Insurance Co.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-29862 Anchor General Insurance Co. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Financial info for Anchor General Insurance Co.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Financial info for Anchor General Insurance Co.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-41966 Anchor General Insurance Co. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Financial info for Anchor General Insurance Co.: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Financial: Anchor General Insurance Co.; Total Financial Assessment $245.00; Total Payments and Credits $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

REESE LAW GROUP E-FILED

Jenny R. Louro, Esq., Bar # 306535

3168 LIONSHEAD AVE 0/8/2018 1:35 PM

CARLSBAD CA 92010 ~260/842-5850 FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

Attorneys for Plaintiff, By: S. Lout, Deputy

ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO.

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF FRESNO

FRESNO JUDICIAL DISTRICT

ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO. Case No. 18CECL05807

| | | | Plaintiff, I

V. ANGEL MARTINEZ aka ANGEL COMPLAINT GUSTAVO MARTINEZ, BEATA GARCIA

GOMEZ AND DOES 1 TO 10,

| Amount Demanded: $7,117.95 Defendants I 1. Plaintiff seeks $7,117.95.

PRELIMINARY ALLEGATIONS

2. Plaintiff is a corporation qualified to do business in California.

3. Defendant ANGEL MARTINEZ aka ANGEL GUSTAVO MARTINEZ is an individual. Defendant BEATA GARCIA GOMEZ is an individual.

4. The true names and capacities of DOES 1 to 10 are unknown at this time. Plaintiff reserves the right to amend this complaint to substitute their true names, capacities and liabilitie when they are ascertained.

5. This is the proper court because the underlying incident upon which this action is

based occurred here.

UNDERLYING LIABILITY

6. On or about May 6, 2016, at HIGHWAY 41 FRESNO, CA, ANGEL MARTINEZ aka ANGEL GUSTAVO MARTINEZ caused PEDRO RODRIGUEZ and his/her permissive users and/or passengers (collectively “the insured") to incur monetary damages. Specifically, at said time and place, ANGEL MARTINEZ aka ANGEL GUSTAVO MARTINEZ and DOE 1 (collectively “DRIVER?) negligently operated a motor vehicle, legally, foreseeably and proximately causing an accident that caused the insured to suffer damages in the amount of $7,117.95. At said time, said DRIVER was operating the motor vehicle with the express or implied permission of BEATA GARCIA GOMEZ ,(collectively “OWNER?”) who was a registered owner, bailee or other person who gained possession and/or control of the vehicle. OWNER was also negligent in entrusting said vehicle to DRIVER and/or was the employer and/or principal of DRIVER who was driving in the course and scope of an employment and/or the agency relationship at the time of the accident or was driving as required by his/her said employer and/or principal for the benefit of his/her said employer and/or principal.

FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION SUBROGATION AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS

7. Plaintiff incorporates the preceding paragraphs as though fully set forth herein.

8. At all relevant times, the insured had a policy of insurance with Plaintiff covering the damages which are the subject of this action. As required by both the policy and Plaintiff's duty of good faith and fair dealing with its insured, Plaintiff investigated the loss, determined it was covered and paid the claim. The total loss was $7,117.95. Plaintiff now seeks subrogation of its payment (and recovery of any uncovered property damage claims assigned by the insured), from all defendants, the parties responsible for causing the loss or who are otherwise liable. [Rossmoor Sanitation, Inc. v. Pylon, Inc. (1975) 13 C3d 622, 633].

9. Accordingly, Plaintiff is entitled to recover $7,117.95.

10. Justice requires that the loss should be entirely shifted from the Plaintiff to the party

to be charged, whose equitable position is inferior to that of Plaintiff.

PRAYER

11. Plaintiff prays for: a. Damages in the amount of $7,117.95. b. Pre-judgment interest. c. Costs of suit.

d. Any other relief the Court deems appropriate.

Date: February 21, 2018 %’_‘CZI 9_5

Jenny R. Louro, Esq. Attorney for Plaintiff