This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:15:36 (UTC).

American Express Bank vs. Luis Blas/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 American Express Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Luis Blas/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2104

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express Bank, FSB, a federal savings bank

Defendant

Blas, Luis

Others

Blas, Luis Blas

Alvarado, Luis Blas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael, Lina M.

555 St. Charles Drive Suite 204 Michael & Associates

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. mn Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of none service filed. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • Proof of service - not served- Comment: Proof of service of Summons and Complaint filed - party Luis Blas not served. 013114 jmo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE325474.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for American Express Bank, FSB, a federal savings bank: Counter Payment Receipt # 325474 American Express Bank, FSB, a federal savings bank $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for American Express Bank, FSB, a federal savings bank: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: American Express Bank, FSB, a federal savings bank; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less