This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:25:25 (UTC).

American Express Bank vs. Bernardo Prado/CC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 American Express Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bernardo Prado/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2096

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express Bank

Defendant

Prado, Bernardo

Other

Prado, Bernardo O.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael, Lina M.

555 St. Charles Drive Suite 204 Michael & Associates

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County:Ventura Amount:$15,141.49

Writ Partially Satisfied

Writ Partially Satisfied; Comment: In the amount of: $4,296.21

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County:Los Angeles Amount: $15,141.49

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied.

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Civil Document; Comment: Requested writ for LA county

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Civil Document; Comment: Requested Writ for Fresno County

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ Partially Satisfied- Writ Partially Satisfied; Comment: In the amount of: $4,296.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County:Ventura Amount:$15,141.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County:Los Angeles Amount: $15,141.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Civil Document; Comment: Requested writ for LA county

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Civil Document; Comment: Requested Writ for Fresno County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE351405.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $ 15,141.49 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . MM Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Financial info for American Express Bank: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00022238 American Express Bank $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Financial info for American Express Bank: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Financial info for American Express Bank: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00022218 American Express Bank $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Financial info for American Express Bank: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Financial: American Express Bank; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less