This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 21:13:56 (UTC).

American Auto Financing Inc vs. Mendoza Porfirio III

Case Summary

On 07/14/2016 American Auto Financing Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mendoza Porfirio III. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1568

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Auto Financing Inc

Defendants

Porfirio III, Mendoza

Mendoza, Porfirio, III

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; American Auto Financing Inc; Awarded Against:; Mendoza, Porfirio, III; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $50.00; Total: $2550.00; Party Names: American Auto Financing Inc; Mendoza, Porfirio, III

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied.

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 2575.00

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Writ of Execution Type of: Writ and case type not selected.

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Writ of Execution Reason: Defendant's name must match judgment dated 09/22/16.

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Name on writ does not match judgment

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Writ of Execution

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Reason: Defendants name must match judgment dated 09/22/16.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Jose Valencia, Rep.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; American Auto Financing Inc; Awarded Against:; Mendoza, Porfirio, III; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $50.00; Total: $2550.00; Party Names: American Auto Financing Inc; Mendoza, Porfirio, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 2575.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Writ of Execution Type of: Writ and case type not selected.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Writ of Execution Reason: Defendant's name must match judgment dated 09/22/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Name on writ does not match judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Reason: Defendants name must match judgment dated 09/22/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2016
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 07/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Financial info for American Auto Financing Inc: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00001931 American Auto Financing Inc $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Financial info for American Auto Financing Inc: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Financial info for American Auto Financing Inc: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00025117 American Auto Financing Inc $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Financial info for American Auto Financing Inc: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Financial: American Auto Financing Inc; Total Financial Assessment $125.00; Total Payments and Credits $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.