This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:14:26 (UTC).

Amelia Sifuentes vs.Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2016 Amelia Sifuentes filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1959

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sifuentes, Amelia

Defendants

Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc.

Piyugina, Svetlana, Medical Doctor

Doe 1

Dickerson, CRNA, Nancy

Doe 2

Omni Anesthesia Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moeck, David M.

Defendant Attorneys

Canepa, Mark B.

Slavin, Howard A.

Egan, Christopher M

Reinholtz, Jack R.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comment: of Due Diligence as to attempted service on Svetlana Pilyugina, M. D.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Motion

Def. Eye-Q's MSJ Notice of Motion and Motion; Comment: Def. Eye-Q's MSJ Notice of Motion and Motion

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Statement filed

Def. Eye-Q's MSJ Separate Stmt. of Undisputed Material Facts; Comment: Def. Eye-Q's MSJ Separate Stmt. of Undisputed Material Facts

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Statement filed

Statement; Comment: Statement of OMNI Anesthesia RE: OSC RE ADR Stipulation and Request to Continue the OSC

Notice Filed

Notice

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James Dilling

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Def. Eye-Q's MSJ Memo. of Points & Authorities; Comment: Def. Eye-Q's MSJ Memo. of Points & Authorities

Notice Filed

Notice

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: To unverified Complaint; 1st Appearance

Notice Filed

Notice

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Sifuentes, Amelia; Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc.; Piyugina, Svetlana, Medical Doctor; Dickerson, CRNA, Nancy; Omni Anesthesia Associates, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal Not Entered- Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Case previously dismissed on 5/7/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Full Dismissal of entire action; Comment: Request for Full Dismissal of entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Mark Canepa

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2017
  • Financial info for Piyugina, Svetlana, Medical Doctor: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Financial: Piyugina, Svetlana, Medical Doctor; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Financial info for Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-11291 Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc. $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Financial info for Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial info for Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-54136 Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc. $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial info for Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial: Eye-Q Vision Care, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,085.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,085.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Financial info for Sifuentes, Amelia: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00022263 Sifuentes, Amelia $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Financial info for Sifuentes, Amelia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Financial: Sifuentes, Amelia; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.