This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 14:30:19 (UTC).

Amber Selinski vs Jonathan Selinski

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 Amber Selinski filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Jonathan Selinski. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Hopper, Cindy, Cardoza, Jane and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3391

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Hopper, Cindy

Cardoza, Jane

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Selinski, Amber J

Respondent

Selinski, Jonathan J

Minor

Selinski, Slayden James

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • 2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure- Comment: Prelim and Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: Clerk: L. Garvin Court Reporter: R. Lundy Bailiff: A. Rivera Petitioner present, sworn Respondent present, sworn Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 5/6/20 Time: 9:30 a.m. Dept.: 202 Other: The Court received a completed Preliminary and Final Declaration of Disclosure from Petitioner. The Court received a completed Change of Address form from Respondent. The child custody and visitation order filed 10/18/2018 shall remain in full force and effect. Each party will keep their own retirement and their own student loans. Petitioner shall receive the 2016 Jeep Patriot. Parties agree to waive spousal support. The Court's jurisdiction over the issue of spousal support is terminated. Petitioner / Respondent ordered to provide for the child(ren)'s health insurance coverage that is available at reasonable or no cost. Petitioner / Respondent ordered to pay 50% of all necessary unreimbursed medical, dental or vision expense for the minor child(ren) per FC4063. Child Support shall be paid by wage assignment Respondent shall pay child support of $184.00 per month beginning on 7/1/2018. Each party to pay 50% of work/education-related child care costs This is a guideline order. Petitioner shall claim the child for income tax purposes on even-numbered tax years and Respondent shall claim the child for income tax purposes on odd-numbered tax years. JUDGMENT: Court finds: This is an uncontested dissolution of marriage. The Court makes the following findings: Irreconcilable differences have arisen causing a complete and irremediable breakdown of the marriage such that no period of counseling or waiting would help restore the marital relationship. Parties waive rights to notice of trial, written statement of decision, right to move for a new trial and right to appeal. Petitioner's former name is not restored. Judgment granted. Court acquired jurisdiction on 7/5/2018 by filing of the Response. Judgment effective upon date of filing. Petitioner is to prepare and submit the judgment for filing and may seek assistance at the Self-Help Center. If judgment is entered prior to the continued hearing date, the hearing may be taken off calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Petitioner: Selinski, Amber J; Parties Present- Respondent: Selinski, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Return Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court Order; Comment: Tier 1-CC/CV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Commissioner Hopper Minute Order: See Attached- Comment: Dept 304 11:50am Commissioner: CJ Hopper Clerk: RBenavente Reporter: RLundy Petitioner/Respondent: Present/ ProPer Other: Parties attended the mediation appointment this morning and reached a full agreement. At the agreement of the parties, the court adopts the custody and visitation with no modifications made. The court date of 10/31/2018 will be vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Child Custody and Visitation Order Signed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • FCS Documents Submitted- Comment: FCS Appointment Summary Full Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • FCS Tier 1 Mediation- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: FCS Same Day Full Agreement; Comment: fa - 1030 mo - 1030; Parties Present- Petitioner: Selinski, Amber J; Parties Present- Respondent: Selinski, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Return Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: FCS Same Day Full Agreement; Parties Present- Petitioner: Selinski, Amber J; Parties Present- Respondent: Selinski, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2018
  • Financial info for Selinski, Jonathan J: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00010338 Selinski, Jonathan J $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Financial info for Selinski, Jonathan J: Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Financial info for Selinski, Jonathan J: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00009457 Selinski, Jonathan J $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Financial info for Selinski, Jonathan J: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Financial: Selinski, Jonathan J; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Financial info for Selinski, Amber J: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00008255 Selinski, Amber J $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Financial info for Selinski, Amber J: Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Financial info for Selinski, Amber J: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00008244 Selinski, Amber J $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Financial info for Selinski, Amber J: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Financial: Selinski, Amber J; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.