Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 08:37:04 (UTC).

Allen Chang vs Centex Homes NON LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 10/22/2013 Allen Chang filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Centex Homes NON LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Smith, Bruce, Black, Donald, Snauffer, Mark and Smith, M. Bruce. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3309

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Smith, Bruce

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

Smith, M. Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chang, Allen

Ashkharian, Hovannes&Azniv

Clay, Jeffrey&Judy

DeAlba, Fernando

Debbas, Maxwell&Nicolle

Gill, Gurmail&Jaswine

Hissong, Ashley

Houk, Michael&Rashell

Keophouangphet, Wilson

Kirkpatrick, Nicholas

Martinez, Richard&Yvonne

Murjan, Hutham

Olivas, Manuel&Guadalup

Turner, Rasheeda

Vang, Phonxaimaharath

Ward, Jeremy&Jennifer

Yanyang, Matthew

Defendant

Centex Homes

Cross Plaintiffs

Spence Fence, a Corporation

DC Painting , a sole owner

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adelman, Fred

Milstein Adelman, Llp 2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Defendant Attorney

Morrow, J. Brian

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Griesner-Malcolm, Stacey L.

Other Attorneys

Campbell, Patrick J.

Kirkgaard, Susan E

Lamond, Christian F

Home, W Stuart, III

Pendleton, Melody Russell

Hammons, Wallace W

Schoneman, Tina L

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Order Consolidating Actions; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions; Party Names: Chang, Allen; Ashkharian, Hovannes&Azniv Clay, Jeffrey&Judy DeAlba, Fernando; Debbas, Maxwell&Nicolle Gill, Gurmail&Jaswine Hissong, Ashley; Houk, Michael&Rashell Keophouangphet, Wilson; Kirkpatrick, Nicholas; Martinez, Richard&Yvonne Murjan, Hutham; Olivas, Manuel&Guadalup Turner, Rasheeda; Vang, Phonxaimaharath; Ward, Jeremy&Jennifer Yanyang, Matthew; Centex Homes; Ward, Matthew; Ward, Aimee; White, Jennifer; Yang, Matthew; Centex Homes, general partnership; A. L. Drywall, Inc.; Air Design, Inc.; Award Construction & Roofing, Inc.; Central Valley Contracting, a Corporation; Coffman, Duane Lee; Darrell Gene Herzog Construction; Expert Masonry, Inc., a Suspended Corporaton; Matsubara Landscape Maintenance; Fresno Precision Plactics, Inc.; G. S. Cement; John Rocha Custom Tractor, a Corporation; Ken Perry Tile, Inc.; Kings River Door, Inc.; M&B Carpentry, Inc.; M&L Plumbing Co., a Corporation; Mayer Roofing of California, IInc,, a Dissolved Corporation; Northern Central Distributing, Inc.; The Peninsula Ggoup, Inc.; Prestige Marble Works, a Corporation; Sacramento Insulation Contractors; Spence Fence, a Corporation; Talons Landscape Development, Inc.; Tom Besmer Construciton, Inc.; Tri-Valley Plastering Inc.; Western Shower Door, Inc.; Windows by Advanced, Inc., a Suspended Corporation; Advanced Insulation, Inc a suspended California Corp; M & B Classic Finish, a Partnership as Roe 2; Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, a Connectic; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, a Conneticu; Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut; Crane, Alan; Garcia, Flora; Kings River Door, Inc.; Roes 1 through 100; Rocha, John; Smith, M. Bruce

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney.

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Order Consolidating Actions; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions; Party Names: Chang, Allen; Ashkharian, Hovannes&Azniv Clay, Jeffrey&Judy DeAlba, Fernando; Debbas, Maxwell&Nicolle Gill, Gurmail&Jaswine Hissong, Ashley; Houk, Michael&Rashell Keophouangphet, Wilson; Kirkpatrick, Nicholas; Martinez, Richard&Yvonne Murjan, Hutham; Olivas, Manuel&Guadalup Turner, Rasheeda; Vang, Phonxaimaharath; Ward, Jeremy&Jennifer Yanyang, Matthew; Centex Homes; Ward, Matthew; Ward, Aimee; White, Jennifer; Yang, Matthew; Centex Homes, general partnership; A. L. Drywall, Inc.; Air Design, Inc.; Award Construction & Roofing, Inc.; Central Valley Contracting, a Corporation; Coffman, Duane Lee; Darrell Gene Herzog Construction; Expert Masonry, Inc., a Suspended Corporaton; Matsubara Landscape Maintenance; Fresno Precision Plactics, Inc.; G. S. Cement; John Rocha Custom Tractor, a Corporation; Ken Perry Tile, Inc.; Kings River Door, Inc.; M&B Carpentry, Inc.; M&L Plumbing Co., a Corporation; Mayer Roofing of California, IInc,, a Dissolved Corporation; Northern Central Distributing, Inc.; The Peninsula Ggoup, Inc.; Prestige Marble Works, a Corporation; Sacramento Insulation Contractors; Spence Fence, a Corporation; Talons Landscape Development, Inc.; Tom Besmer Construciton, Inc.; Tri-Valley Plastering Inc.; Western Shower Door, Inc.; Windows by Advanced, Inc., a Suspended Corporation; Advanced Insulation, Inc a suspended California Corp; M & B Classic Finish, a Partnership as Roe 2; Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, a Connectic; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, a Conneticu; Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut; Crane, Alan; Garcia, Flora; Kings River Door, Inc.; Roes 1 through 100; Rocha, John; Smith, M. Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Hearing- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: For reference only (13CECG02356)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and cross complaint filed showing substituted service on Jarred Rocha, son, mailed on 2-9-15. sg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Association of attorneys filed- Comment: Association of attorneys filed as to Defendant's Atty. . Associated attorney David S. Lee. gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Affidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit of reasonable diligence filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Amendment to document filed- Comment: Centex Homes Roe Amendment No 3 filed. csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • Notice of change of address- Comment: Notice of change of Firm Affiliation and contact information filed as to Tina L Schoneman, Esq New Firm Affiliation Benton, Orr Duval & Buckingham . csp

    Read MoreRead Less
183 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2014
  • Financial: Fresno Precision Plactics, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Financial info for Centex Homes: Counter Payment Receipt # 192700 Centex Homes $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Financial info for Centex Homes: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Financial info for Centex Homes: Counter Payment Receipt # 187768 Centex Homes $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Financial info for Centex Homes: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Financial: Centex Homes; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • Financial info for Chang, Allen: Counter Payment Receipt # 183228 Chang, Allen $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • Financial info for Chang, Allen: Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • Financial info for Chang, Allen: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • Financial: Chang, Allen; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spence Fence Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Centex Homes n/k/a Pulte Home Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRKGAARD, SUSAN E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMOND CHRISTIAN F. ESQ.