This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 22:39:43 (UTC).

Alize Negron vs.Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Case Summary

On 07/25/2016 Alize Negron filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Diaz, Monica and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2373

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Conroy, Tricia

Solis, Isabelle

Negron, Alize

Defendants

Clovis Community Hospital

Holloway M.D., Nathaniel

Ruiz, DPM, Felipe

Cazzell, DPM, Shawn

Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moeck, David M.

Defendant Attorneys

White, William M.

Ball, Michael F.

Salinas, Richard S

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice of Designation of Trial Attorney; Comment: Notice of Designation of Trial Attorney

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CORRECTED: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (mailed to attorney)

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fees posted for defendant in the amount of $150.00

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Clovis Community Hospital

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 14 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 9:37 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation Regarding Alternative Disputer Resolution (ADR); Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator:James Dilling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received- Application; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 14 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2017
  • Financial info for Ruiz, DPM, Felipe: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Financial info for Ruiz, DPM, Felipe: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-00541 Ruiz, DPM, Felipe $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Financial info for Ruiz, DPM, Felipe: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Financial: Ruiz, DPM, Felipe; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-67640 Clovis Community Hospital $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Financial: Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial info for Negron, Alize: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-31732 Negron, Alize $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial info for Negron, Alize: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Financial: Negron, Alize; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.