This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:19:36 (UTC).

Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC vs Laurricia Vaughn

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Laurricia Vaughn. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1520

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC

Defendant

Vaughn, Laurricia

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leifer, William H.

Defendant Attorney

Vaughn, Laurricia B.

 

Court Documents

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution filed wholly satisfied as to possession only

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC; Vaughn, Laurricia; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 4985 N. Holt, #204 Fresno, CA 93705; Other: A right to a monetary judgment is hereby reserved.; Awarded Against:; Vaughn, Laurricia

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 4985 N. Holt, #204 Fresno, CA 93705; Awarded Against:; Vaughn, Laurricia

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC; Vaughn, Laurricia; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 4985 N. Holt, #204 Fresno, CA 93705; Other: A right to a monetary judgment is hereby reserved.; Awarded Against:; Vaughn, Laurricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 4985 N. Holt, #204 Fresno, CA 93705; Awarded Against:; Vaughn, Laurricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Settled Case Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 9:04 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 401 Order for: Application for Writ of Possession and Order Thereon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Chambers Work - Post- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution filed wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 07-FEB-2014 by RALVAREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Certificate of mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Minuter Order was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California 93724. ja

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE323992.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on UD Complaint filed. ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 ed Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by EDUQUE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Financial info for Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00014794 Leifer, William H. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Financial info for Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Financial: Ali Najafi Enterprises, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less