This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:21:24 (UTC).

Alfredo Arreguin v Alfredo Razo/UD

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Alfredo Arreguin filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Alfredo Razo/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1517

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arreguin, Alfredo

Defendant

Razo, Alfredo

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arreguin, Alfredo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Judgment entered 01/24/14. sam.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff(s) Alfredo Arreguin against defendant(s) Alfredo Razo on 01/24/14 for restitution of the premises only: 551 N. 3rd Street, Fresno, CA 93702. sam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment blue runner tag box 3 ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Alfredo Razo. sam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. sam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Adult Male, mailed on 12/19/13. sam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 19-DEC-2013 by CYBARRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 19-DEC-2013 by CYBARRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MKNISPEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE323981.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 mk Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less