This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:27:56 (UTC).

Alexis A. Pena vs Nicholas D. Pena

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Alexis A Pena filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Nicholas D Pena. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Duncan, Ronda, Meehan, Kathleen A and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6650

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Duncan, Ronda

Meehan, Kathleen A

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Pena, Alexis A.

Fresno, CA 93705

Respondent

Pena, Nicholas D.

Minor

Pena, Lilliana M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date: 6/20/14 Scanned Date: 8/5/14 tf 080514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for cmc scheduled for 1-6-15. Judgment entered 6-20-14 dk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: scanning 6-20-14 dk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment filed. copies mailed to parties 6-20-14 dk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg- Comment: Marital status terminates 7-18-14 6-20-14 dk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to FLIC for appointment: sk 6/18/14

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2014
  • Proof of service-summons filed- Comment: Proof of service of summons on FL petn for disso marr, blk response; compltd & blk uccjea dec, dec of discl, schedule of assets & debts, I&E dec; Req for order, and blk resp de to req for order; ntc of cal setting filed showing service on Nicholas D Penaby pers service on 12/30/13. ms 1//6/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Income & Expense Declaration- Comment: Income and Expense Declaration filed. lml 12/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • OSC re: readiness hrg no fee- Comment: Request for Order regarding readiness hearing no fee: Child Custody/Visitation, Child Support Date: 01/22/14 Time: 8:15am Dept: 204 No mediation set. lml 12/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by HYANEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona hgy 12/16/13 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Uniform custody juris- Comment: Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: 11/13 to the present. hgy 12/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Order Granting Waiver of Fees- Comment: Order signed Yes _x__ No ___ hgy 12/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. hgy 12/16/13 Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _x__ No ___: assigned to Judge RMD hgy 12/16/13 Event: Pet Disso Marr w/child-No Fees

    Read MoreRead Less