This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 10:43:15 (UTC).

Alder Creek Properties, LLC vs. Brandy Stocker

Case Summary

On 10/28/2016 Alder Creek Properties, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Brandy Stocker. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Gamoian, Lisa, Cabrera, Carlos and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8718

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

Cabrera, Carlos

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alder Creek Properties, LLC

Defendants

Stocker, Brandy

Stocker, Brandy Monique

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hrdlicka, Steven R

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Alder Creek Properties, LLC; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Stocker, Brandy Monique; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $3,417.00; Holdover Damages: $437.80; Attorney Fees: $1,400.00; Costs: $510.00; Total: $5,764.80

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0 Credit: $0 Interest: $14.21

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe; Comment: By Clerk

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: By Mail

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI DIsmissal

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

Judgment

Judgment - Restitution of Premises; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Judgment - Restitution of Premises; Party Names: Alder Creek Properties, LLC; Stocker, Brandy Monique; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Alder Creek Properties, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 164 N. Effie St. #A, Fresno, CA 93701; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Stocker, Brandy Monique

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, partially satisfied in the amount of $48.02

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $5,804.01

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied as to possession only

At Issue Memorandum

At Issue Memorandum

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10 only

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Answer Filed

Answer Filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Alder Creek Properties, LLC; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Stocker, Brandy Monique; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $3,417.00; Holdover Damages: $437.80; Attorney Fees: $1,400.00; Costs: $510.00; Total: $5,764.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment - Restitution of Premises; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Judgment - Restitution of Premises; Party Names: Alder Creek Properties, LLC; Stocker, Brandy Monique; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Alder Creek Properties, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 164 N. Effie St. #A, Fresno, CA 93701; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Stocker, Brandy Monique

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract; Comment: Amount: $5,764.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, partially satisfied in the amount of $48.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $5,804.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0 Credit: $0 Interest: $14.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2016
  • Financial: Stocker, Brandy Monique; Total Financial Assessment $229.00; Total Payments and Credits $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Financial info for Alder Creek Properties, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-75939 Alder Creek Properties, LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Financial info for Alder Creek Properties, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Financial info for Alder Creek Properties, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00003202 Hrdlicka, Steven R $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Financial info for Alder Creek Properties, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for Alder Creek Properties, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00039358 Hrdlicka, Steven R $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for Alder Creek Properties, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Financial info for Alder Creek Properties, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00036276 Hrdlicka, Steven R $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Financial info for Alder Creek Properties, LLC: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Financial: Alder Creek Properties, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $315.00; Total Payments and Credits $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.